EP2352360 - SUBSTRATE FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICE, ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING SAME AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/31] | SUBSTRATE FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING SAME, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME AND SUBSTRATE FOR ORGANIC LED ELEMENT | ||
[2021/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGC Inc. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2018/39] |
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited Shin-Marunouchi Building 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | ||
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA Nobuhiro c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 02 /
AOKI Yumiko c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 03 /
WADA Naoya c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2021/37] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
NAKAMURA Nobuhiro c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | ||
02 /
AOKI Yumiko c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | |||
03 /
WADA Naoya c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2021/37] |
Former [2011/31] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09819146.3 | 02.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009JP67277 | Priority number, date | JP20080259948 | 06.10.2008 Original published format: JP 2008259948 | [2011/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010041611 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2352360 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2352360 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/52 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
H10K50/854 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/814 (EP,KR,US);
H10K77/10 (KR);
Y02E10/549 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP);
Y10T29/49117 (US)
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | H05B33/02, H01L51/50, H05B33/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] |
Former [2011/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTRAT FÜR EIN ELEKTRONISCHES BAUELEMENT, ELEKTRONISCHES BAUELEMENT DAMIT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/23] | English: | SUBSTRATE FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICE, ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING SAME AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2021/23] | French: | SUBSTRAT POUR DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE L'UTILISANT ET PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE CELUI-CI | [2021/23] |
Former [2011/31] | SUBSTRAT FÜR EIN ELEKTRONISCHES BAUELEMENT, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, DIESES VERWENDENDES ELEKTRONISCHES BAUELEMENT, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND SUBSTRAT FÜR EIN ORGANISCHES LED-ELEMENT | ||
Former [2011/31] | SUBSTRATE FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING SAME, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME AND SUBSTRATE FOR ORGANIC LED ELEMENT | ||
Former [2011/31] | SUBSTRAT POUR DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, PROCÉDÉ POUR LE PRODUIRE, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE L'UTILISANT, PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE CELUI-CI ET SUBSTRAT POUR ÉLÉMENT DE DEL ORGANIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2011 | Translation filed | 07.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 01.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 05.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2019 | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.10.2009 | AT | 15.09.2021 | CY | 15.09.2021 | CZ | 15.09.2021 | DK | 15.09.2021 | EE | 15.09.2021 | ES | 15.09.2021 | FI | 15.09.2021 | HR | 15.09.2021 | IT | 15.09.2021 | LT | 15.09.2021 | LV | 15.09.2021 | MC | 15.09.2021 | MK | 15.09.2021 | MT | 15.09.2021 | NL | 15.09.2021 | PL | 15.09.2021 | RO | 15.09.2021 | SE | 15.09.2021 | SI | 15.09.2021 | SK | 15.09.2021 | SM | 15.09.2021 | TR | 15.09.2021 | IE | 02.10.2021 | LU | 02.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | FR | 15.11.2021 | BG | 15.12.2021 | GB | 15.12.2021 | NO | 15.12.2021 | GR | 16.12.2021 | IS | 15.01.2022 | PT | 17.01.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 02.10.2009 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
MK | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
TR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 02.10.2021 | ||
LU | 02.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
FR | 15.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 02.10.2009 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
MK | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 02.10.2021 | ||
LU | 02.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
FR | 15.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 02.10.2009 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 02.10.2021 | ||
LU | 02.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
FR | 15.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 02.10.2021 | ||
LU | 02.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
FR | 15.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 02.10.2021 | ||
LU | 02.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
FR | 15.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 02.10.2021 | ||
LU | 02.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
FR | 15.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 02.10.2021 | ||
LU | 02.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 02.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 02.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 02.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 02.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/12] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 15.09.2021 | |
NO | 15.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9734447 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5-8,11 * abstract * [Y] 2,4,9,10; | EP0888035 [ ] (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [ ] * figure 6 * * page 5, line 48 - page 6, line 7 * * page 6, line 45 - page 8, line 37 *; | [Y]JP2000268980 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [Y] 4 * abstract *; | [Y]WO0237568 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 2,9,10 * page 9, lines 17-30 * * page 11, lines 3-7 *; | [A]US2008079015 (KRUMMACHER BENJAMIN CLAUS [DE]) [A] 2,9,10* paragraph [0043] * | International search | [X]WO9734447 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2005149907 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB); | [Y]JP2005150105 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB); | [Y]JP2005308832 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2007250435 (CANON KK); | [X]WO2008035556 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) | Examination | EP1548856 | JP2006222028 | JP2007141728 | by applicant | JPH0892551 | JP2931211B | JP2008259948 |