EP2348049 - APPLICATION OF AIMP1 POLYPEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/30] | NOVEL APPLICATION OF AIMP1 POLYPEPTIDE | ||
[2013/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medicinal Bioconvergence Research Center 8th Fl. B-dong Advanced Institutes of Convergence Technology 864-1, lui-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-270 / KR | [2014/13] |
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states SNU R&DB Foundation San 56-1, Sillim-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Sunghoon 1709 Tower Palace F-dong Dogok 2-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-536 / KR | 02 /
HAN, Jung Min 138-601 Gwanakdreamtown Apt. Bongcheon 5-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-774 / KR | [2013/40] |
Former [2011/30] | 01 /
KIM, Sunghoon 1709 Tower Palace F-dong Dogok 2-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-536 / KR | ||
02 /
HAN, Jung Min 138-601 Gwanakdreamtown Apt. Bongcheon 5-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-774 / KR | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2011/30] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 09819399.8 | 09.10.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009KR05778 | Priority number, date | KR20080099782 | 10.10.2008 Original published format: KR 20080099782 | [2011/30] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010041892 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2348049 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2348049 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/564 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
G01N33/564 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2800/102 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/13] | C07K16/18, G01N33/564 | ||
Former IPC [2011/30] | C07K16/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANWENDUNG DES AIMP1-POLYPEPTIDS | [2013/15] | English: | APPLICATION OF AIMP1 POLYPEPTIDE | [2013/15] | French: | UTILISATION DU POLYPEPTIDE AIMP1 | [2013/15] |
Former [2011/30] | NEUE ANWENDUNG DES AIMP1-POLYPEPTIDS | ||
Former [2011/30] | NOVEL APPLICATION OF AIMP1 POLYPEPTIDE | ||
Former [2011/30] | NOUVELLE UTILISATION DU POLYPEPTIDE AIMP1 | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2011 | Translation filed | 05.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 17.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.10.2009 | AT | 02.10.2013 | BE | 02.10.2013 | BG | 02.10.2013 | CY | 02.10.2013 | CZ | 02.10.2013 | DK | 02.10.2013 | EE | 02.10.2013 | ES | 02.10.2013 | FI | 02.10.2013 | HR | 02.10.2013 | IT | 02.10.2013 | LT | 02.10.2013 | LV | 02.10.2013 | MC | 02.10.2013 | MK | 02.10.2013 | MT | 02.10.2013 | NL | 02.10.2013 | PL | 02.10.2013 | RO | 02.10.2013 | SE | 02.10.2013 | SI | 02.10.2013 | SK | 02.10.2013 | SM | 02.10.2013 | TR | 02.10.2013 | IE | 09.10.2013 | LU | 09.10.2013 | NO | 01.01.2014 | GR | 03.01.2014 | IS | 02.02.2014 | PT | 03.02.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2016/21] | HU | 09.10.2009 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
GR | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
TR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 09.10.2013 | ||
LU | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/41] | HU | 09.10.2009 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
GR | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
TR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 09.10.2013 | ||
LU | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | HU | 09.10.2009 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
GR | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
TR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 09.10.2013 | ||
LU | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 09.10.2009 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
TR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 09.10.2013 | ||
LU | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
TR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 02.10.2013 | |
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 02.10.2013 | |
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 02.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2007100058 (UNIV CHIBA NAT UNIV CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 5,6,8 * abstract *; | EP2006681 [ ] (UNIV CHIBA NAT UNIV CORP [JP]) [ ] * claims 1-7 *; | [X]US6228837 (STERN DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * columns 2,10; claim 1; sequence 36 *; | [X]WO2008007818 (SEOUL NAT UNIV IND FOUNDATION [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * pages 9,15; figures 1-7,15; example 1; claims 1,12; sequence 1 *; | [XP]WO2008133359 (IMAGENE CO LTD [KR], et al) [XP] 1-8 * pages 8,39; claims 11,12 * | [Y] - GU J ET AL, "CLUES TO PATHOGENESIS OF SPONDYLOARTHROPATHY DERIVED FROM SYNOVIAL FLUID MONONUCLEAR CELL GENE EXPRESSION PROFILES", JOURNAL OF RHEUMATOLOGY, JOURNAL OF RHEUMATOLOGY PUBLISHING COMPANY, CA, (20021001), vol. 29, no. 10, ISSN 0315-162X, pages 2159 - 2164, XP008029647 [Y] 5,6,8 * abstract * | [X] - ARIANNA BOTTONI ET AL, "Proteasomes and RARS modulate AIMP1/EMAP II secretion in human cancer cell lines", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR PHYSIOLOGY, (20070801), vol. 212, no. 2, doi:10.1002/jcp.21083, ISSN 0021-9541, pages 293 - 297, XP055019487 [X] 1-4,7 * abstract * * page 294 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jcp.21083 | [ ] - "AIMP1_HUMAN", UniProt, (20060124), Database accession no. Q12904, XP002669672 | International search | [A]WO0195927 (IMAGENE CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]EP1384486 (SEOUL NAT UNIV IND FOUNDATION [KR]) | [X] - KO, Y. G. ET AL., "A cofactor oftRNA synthetase, p43, is secreted to up-regulated proinflammatory genes.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20010405), vol. 276, no. 25, pages 23028 - 23033, XP008120067 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.m101544200 | [A] - HAN, J. M. ET AL., "Aminoacyl-tRNA synthetase-interacting multifunctional protein 1/p43 controls endoplasmic reticulum retention of heat shock protein gp96:its pathological implications in lupus-like autoimmune disease.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY., (200706), vol. 170, no. 6, pages 2042 - 2054, XP008136864 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2353/ajpath.2007.061266 | [A] - KIM, E. ET AL., "AIMP1/p43 protein induces the maturation of bone marrow-derived dendritic cells with T-helper type 1-polarizing ability.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20080301), vol. 180, no. 5, pages 2894 - 2902, XP008136870 | [A] - KIM. T. S. ET AL., "Gene transfer of AIMP1 and B7. 1 into epitope-loaded, fibroblasts induces tumor-specific CTL immunity, and prolongs the survival period of tumor-bearing mice.", VACCINE., (20080913), vol. 26, no. 47, pages 5928 - 5934, XP025613276 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2008.08.051 | by applicant | - SANG GYU PARK ET AL., TRENDS IN BIOCHEMICAL SCIENCES, (2005), vol. 30, pages 569 - 574 | - DEUTSCHER, M. P., METHOD ENZYMOL, (1974), vol. 29, pages 577 - 583 | - DANG C. V. ET AL., INT. J. BIOCHEM., (1982), vol. 14, pages 539 - 543 | - MIRANDE, M. ET AL., EMBO J., (1982), vol. 1, pages 733 - 736 | - YANG D. C. ET AL., CURR. TOP. CELL. REGUL., (1985), vol. 26, pages 325 - 335 | - PARK S. G. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 16673 - 16676 | - PARK S. G. ET AL., AM. J. PATHOL., (2005), vol. 166, pages 387 - 398 | - BARNETT G. ET AL., CANCER RES., (2000), vol. 60, pages 2850 - 2857 | - DAYHOFF ET AL., ATLAS OF PROTEIN SEQUENCE AND STRUCTURE, (1978), vol. 5, no. 3 | - KOHLER, MILSTEIN, EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1976), vol. 6, pages 511 - 519 | - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, no. 58, pages 1 - 597 | - HITZEMAN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 255, pages 12073 - 12080 | - CRITICAL REVIEWS IN CLINICAL LABORATORY SCIENCES, (2007), vol. 44, pages 339 - 363 |