EP2335156 - VIRTUALIZED STORAGE ASSIGNMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSHINS, Jacob c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2015/35] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
OSHINS, Jacob c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/35] |
Former [2011/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09819670.2 | 30.09.2009 | [2011/25] | WO2009US59124 | Priority number, date | US20080248299 | 09.10.2008 Original published format: US 248299 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010042374 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2335156 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2335156 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/455, G06F9/30, G06F13/10 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
G06F13/105 (EP,KR,US);
G06F13/14 (KR);
G06F9/06 (KR);
G06F9/45504 (KR);
G06F9/45558 (EP,KR,US);
G06F2009/45579 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/25] | G06F13/14, G06F9/44, G06F9/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2011/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZUWEISUNG EINES VIRTUALISIERTEN SPEICHERS | [2011/25] | English: | VIRTUALIZED STORAGE ASSIGNMENT METHOD | [2011/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ATTRIBUTION DE STOCKAGE VIRTUALISÉ | [2011/25] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 16.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2009 | AT | 26.08.2015 | BE | 26.08.2015 | BG | 26.08.2015 | CY | 26.08.2015 | CZ | 26.08.2015 | DK | 26.08.2015 | EE | 26.08.2015 | ES | 26.08.2015 | FI | 26.08.2015 | HR | 26.08.2015 | IT | 26.08.2015 | LT | 26.08.2015 | LV | 26.08.2015 | MC | 26.08.2015 | MK | 26.08.2015 | MT | 26.08.2015 | NL | 26.08.2015 | PL | 26.08.2015 | RO | 26.08.2015 | SE | 26.08.2015 | SI | 26.08.2015 | SK | 26.08.2015 | SM | 26.08.2015 | TR | 26.08.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | IE | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | LU | 30.09.2015 | NO | 26.11.2015 | GR | 27.11.2015 | IS | 26.12.2015 | PT | 28.12.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 30.09.2009 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
BG | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 30.09.2009 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
BG | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 26.08.2015 | |
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 26.08.2015 | |
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 26.08.2015 | |
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 26.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006212870 (ARNDT RICHARD L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0 50] - [0053]; figure 7 *; | [A]US2008147887 (FREIMUTH DOUGLAS M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] *; | [IA]WO2008068132 (IBM [US], et al) [I] 1,12,14 * abstract * * page 18, line 26 - page 20, line 25 * [A] 2-11,13,15 | International search | [A]US2008082975 (ONEY ADRIAN J [US], et al); | [A]US2004172636 (DO CAM-THUY [US], et al); | [A]US2006005186 (NEIL MIKE [US]); | [A]US2008184273 (SEKAR SRINIVASAN [IN]); | [A]US2005091441 (QI YANLING [US], et al); | [A]US7080172 (SCHMALZ JOACHIM [DE]) |