EP2367489 - CERCLAGE SYSTEM FOR BONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acute Innovations, LLC 21421 NW Jacobson Road Suite 700 Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | For all designated states Acute Innovations, Llc 21421 NW Jacobson Road Suite 700 Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILLARD, Joel 6937 NE Alameda Street Portland OR 97213 / US | 02 /
KNIGHT, Mariah 757 SE 8th Avenue Hillsboro OR 97123 / US | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Mill House North Street York YO1 6JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York YO1 6JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 09820047.0 | 13.10.2009 | WO2009US60519 | Priority number, date | US20080249252 | 10.10.2008 Original published format: US 249252 | [2011/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010042946 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2367489 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/82, A61B17/80, A61B17/88 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
A61B17/8076 (EP,US);
A61B17/809 (EP,US);
A61B17/82 (GB);
A61B17/823 (EP,GB,US);
A61B17/8869 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/39] | A61B17/82 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | CERCLAGE-SYSTEM FÜR KNOCHEN | [2011/39] | English: | CERCLAGE SYSTEM FOR BONE | [2011/39] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CERCLAGE OSSEUX | [2011/39] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/39] | 14.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/52] | 08.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5665088 (GIL CARLOS E [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 46; figures 1-6 * [Y] 3-8; | [Y]US4269180 (DALL DESMOND M ET AL) [Y] 3-8 * figures 3,6 *; | [Y]US5702399 (KILPELA THOMAS S [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US7229444 (BOYD HAROLD S [US]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5741259 (CHAN KWAN-HO [US]) [Y] 1,2 * column 5, line 1 - column 3, line 8; figures 1,11,14 *; | [Y]US6017347 (HUEBNER RANDALL J [US] ET AL) [Y] 1,2 * figure 15 *; | [A]US2005124996 (HEARN JAMES P [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | International search | [X]US5702399 (KILPELA THOMAS S [US], et al); | [Y]US7229444 (BOYD HAROLD S [US]); | [Y]US2005240198 (ALBERTSON THOMAS [US], et al); | [Y]EP1080693 (ZURBRUEGG HEINZ R [CH]); | [A]US5993452 (VANDEWALLE MARK V [US]); | [A]US7255701 (ALLEN C WAYNE [US], et al) | by applicant | US5665088 | US4269180 | US5702399 | US7229444 | US5741259 | US6017347 | US2005124996 |