EP2347601 - IMPLANTABLE MICROPHONE SYSTEM AND CALIBRATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cochlear Limited 14 Mars Road Lane Cove, NSW 2066 / AU | [2011/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WISKERKE, Pieter 14 Mars Road Lane Cove New South Wales 2066 / AU | 02 /
HAVRANEK, Miroslav 14 Mars Road Lane Cove New South Wales 2066 / AU | [2011/30] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09820120.5 | 14.10.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009AU01372 | Priority number, date | AU20080905307 | 14.10.2008 Original published format: AU 2008905307 | [2011/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010043001 | Date: | 22.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2347601 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 22.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, A61F2/18, A61F11/00, A61N1/08 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
H04R25/30 (EP,US);
A61N1/36038 (EP,US);
H04R25/606 (EP,US);
H04R29/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/30] | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARES MIKROFONSYSTEM UND KALIBRIERVERFAHREN | [2011/30] | English: | IMPLANTABLE MICROPHONE SYSTEM AND CALIBRATION PROCESS | [2011/30] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MICROPHONE IMPLANTABLE ET PROCESSUS D ÉTALONNAGE | [2011/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 01.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/48] | 17.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6553263 (MEADOWS PAUL M [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 10 - line 22 ** column 10, line 32 - line 38 *; | [Y]US2008085023 (KULKARNI ABHIJIT [US], et al) [Y] 3,5 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraphs [0028] , [0037] *; | [XY]US2008132750 (MILLER SCOTT ALLAN [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0010] , [0047] , [0050] * [Y] 3,5 | International search | [X]WO9730565 (NEUKERMANS ARMAND P [US]); | [A]US5999856 (KENNEDY JOEL A [US]); | [A]US6807445 (BAUMANN JOACHIM W [DE], et al); | [Y]US7204799 (MILLER III SCOTT ALLAN [US], et al); | [X]US7214179 (MILLER III SCOTT ALLAN [US], et al); | [X]US2008132750 (MILLER SCOTT ALLAN [US]) |