EP2346891 - CLARIFICATION PROCESS AT HIGHER CELL DENSITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Percivia LLC. One Hampshire Street, 5th Floor Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2011/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZARBIS-PAPASTOITSIS, Grigorios 34 Phillips Street Watertown Massachusetts 02139 / US | 02 /
KUCZEWSKI, Michael Christopher 415 Albemarle Rd. Newton Massachusetts 02460 / US | 03 /
BELCHER SCHIRMER, Emily 171 Union Street Everett MA 02149 / US | [2011/30] | Representative(s) | Sanderson, James L.C., et al Sanderson & Co. 34 East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/30] | Sanderson, James L.C., et al Sanderson & Co., 34 East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | Application number, filing date | 09820285.6 | 16.10.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009EP63565 | Priority number, date | US20080106320P | 17.10.2008 Original published format: US 106320 P | EP20080167506 | 24.10.2008 Original published format: EP 08167506 | [2011/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010043700 | Date: | 22.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2346891 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/18, C12N5/00 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
C07K1/18 (EP,KR);
C12Q1/02 (KR);
C12P21/00 (KR);
C12Q1/24 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/30] | Title | German: | KLÄRUNGSVERFAHREN BEI HÖHERER ZELLDICHTE | [2011/30] | English: | CLARIFICATION PROCESS AT HIGHER CELL DENSITY | [2011/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CLARIFICATION À UNE DENSITÉ DE CELLULES SUPÉRIEURE | [2011/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 05.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/47] | 24.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2003170810 (VEDADI MASOUD [CA], et al) [I] 1-11 * paragraph [0067] *; | [A]WO2007123961 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-11 |