EP2346041 - OBJECTIVE LENS AND OPTICAL PICKUP DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konica Minolta Opto, Inc. 2970 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8505 / JP | [2011/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOTSUKA Hidekazu c/o Konica Minolta Opto Inc. 2970 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8505 / JP | [2011/29] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/29] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09820533.9 | 06.10.2009 | [2011/29] | WO2009JP67404 | Priority number, date | JP20080268663 | 17.10.2008 Original published format: JP 2008268663 | [2011/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010044355 | Date: | 22.04.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2346041 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/135, G02B13/00, G02B13/18, G11B7/125 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
G02B27/0025 (EP,US);
G11B7/1374 (EP,US);
G11B7/13922 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/29] | Title | German: | OBJEKTIVLINSE UND OPTISCHE PICKUP-ANORDNUNG | [2011/29] | English: | OBJECTIVE LENS AND OPTICAL PICKUP DEVICE | [2011/29] | French: | LENTILLE DE FOCALISATION ET TÊTE OPTIQUE | [2011/29] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2011 | Translation filed | 13.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/43] | 12.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2007133967 (CANON KK); | [X]JP2005108398 (RICOH KK); | [Y]JP2007328886 (KONICA MINOLTA OPTO INC); | [XP]JP2009211775 (HITACHI MAXELL) | by applicant | JP2002082280 |