EP2361342 - CIRCULATED HEATED TRANSFER FLUID HEATING OF SUBSURFACE HYDROCARBON FORMATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] | Applicant(s) | For:SM
Shell Oil Company One Shell Plaza P.O. Box 2463 Houston, TX 77252-2463 / US | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [2011/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Renfeng, Richard 14422 Basalt Lane Houston, TX 77077 / US | 02 /
NGUYEN, Scott Vinh 3000 Bissonnet Street 7311 Houston, TX 77005 / US | [2011/35] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 09821044.6 | 09.10.2009 | WO2009US60090 | Priority number, date | US20080104974P | 13.10.2008 Original published format: US 104974 P | US20090168498P | 10.04.2009 Original published format: US 168498 P | [2011/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010045097 | Date: | 22.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2361342 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E21B36/00 | [2011/35] | CPC: |
H05B3/48 (EP,US);
E21B43/24 (US);
E21B43/2401 (EP,US);
E21B44/02 (US);
H01C3/00 (EP,US);
E21B43/2405 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ERHITZUNG VON UNTERSEE-KOHLENWASSERSTOFFFORMATIONEN DURCH EINE ZIRKULIERENDE ERHITZTE TRANSFERFLÜSSIGKEIT | [2011/35] | English: | CIRCULATED HEATED TRANSFER FLUID HEATING OF SUBSURFACE HYDROCARBON FORMATIONS | [2011/35] | French: | CHAUFFAGE DE FLUIDE DE TRANSFERT CHAUFFÉ EN CIRCULATION DE FORMATIONS D'HYDROCARBURE SOUTERRAINES | [2011/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/41] | 06.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3358756 (VOGEL JOHN V); | [Y]US4257650 (ALLEN JOSEPH C); | [X]US4401162 (OSBORNE JOHN S [US]); | [Y]US5816325 (HYTKEN KENT B [US]); | [Y]US2008078551 (DEVAULT ROBERT C [US], et al) |