EP2353179 - FLEXIBLE CIRCUIT ASSEMBLIES WITHOUT SOLDER AND METHODS FOR THEIR MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Occam Portfolio LLC 20400 Stevens Creek Blvd. Fifth Floor Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2011/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FJELSTAD, Joseph C. 28121 - 231st Place SE Maple Valley, WA 98038 / US | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | Howson, Richard Giles Bentham, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Howson, Richard G.B., et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/32] | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09821348.1 | 16.10.2009 | [2011/32] | WO2009US61063 | Priority number, date | US20080106398P | 17.10.2008 Original published format: US 106398 P | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010045594 | Date: | 22.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2353179 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/60 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
H05K1/189 (EP,US);
H05K3/32 (EP,US);
H01L21/568 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L24/31 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1815 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3025 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09481 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1316 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1469 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48227 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE SCHALTBAUGRUPPEN OHNE LÖTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/32] | English: | FLEXIBLE CIRCUIT ASSEMBLIES WITHOUT SOLDER AND METHODS FOR THEIR MANUFACTURE | [2011/32] | French: | ENSEMBLES CIRCUITS FLEXIBLES SANS BRASURE ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉS | [2011/32] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 21.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/41] | 15.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2008205012 (HEINEMANN ERIK [DE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * [A] 2-7; | [YA]US6905914 (HUEMOELLER RONALD PATRICK [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 46 - column 9, line 35; figures 1A-11 * [A] 2-7; | [YP]US2008299787 (CHUNG KILYOAN [KR], et al) [YP] 1 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0068]; figure 3 * | International search | [A]US7192807 (HUEMOELLER RONALD PATRICK [US], et al); | [A]US2002025607 (DANNO TADATOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2006151860 (ISLAM SHAFIDUL [US], et al); | [A]WO2004001848 (BJORSELL STEN [IE]) |