EP2361229 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ANAEROBIC DIGESTION AND COLLECTION OF PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Socati Technologies-Oregon, LLC 612 Brazos Street Austin, Texas 78701 / US | [2020/23] |
Former [2020/08] | For all designated states Socati Montana LLC 5840 Expressway Missoula, Montana 59808 / US | ||
Former [2011/35] | For all designated states Blue Marble Energy Corporation P.O.Box 9190 Seattle, WA 98109 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEPHENS, James 21723 102nd Ave. SE Snohomish, WA 98296 / US | [2011/35] | Representative(s) | Novitas Patent AB P.O. Box 55557 102 04 Stockholm / SE | [2020/24] |
Former [2011/35] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09822331.6 | 21.10.2009 | [2020/24] | WO2009US05769 | Priority number, date | US20080107279P | 21.10.2008 Original published format: US 107279 P | [2011/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010047815 | Date: | 29.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2361229 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2361229 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/40, C12P3/00, C12M1/107, C12M1/00, C12P5/02 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
C12M21/04 (EP,GB,US);
C02F11/04 (GB);
C12M1/00 (GB);
C12M1/107 (GB);
C12M21/12 (EP,US);
C12M23/58 (US);
C12M43/06 (EP,US);
C12M43/08 (EP,US);
C12P3/00 (EP,US);
C12P39/00 (GB);
C12P5/00 (GB);
C12P5/023 (EP,GB,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/35] | C02F11/04, C12P5/02, C12R1/01 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANAEROBEN GÄRUNG UND SAMMLUNG VON PRODUKTEN | [2019/46] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ANAEROBIC DIGESTION AND COLLECTION OF PRODUCTS | [2011/35] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DIGESTION ANAÉROBIE ET DE COLLECTE DE PRODUITS | [2011/35] |
Former [2011/35] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANAEROBEN FAULUNG UND SAMMLUNG VON PRODUKTEN | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 28.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2009 | AT | 10.06.2020 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | DK | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | FI | 10.06.2020 | HR | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | MK | 10.06.2020 | MT | 10.06.2020 | PL | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | SE | 10.06.2020 | SI | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | SM | 10.06.2020 | TR | 10.06.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | NO | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | IS | 10.10.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | GB | 21.10.2020 | IE | 21.10.2020 | IT | 21.10.2020 | LU | 21.10.2020 | ES | 22.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | FR | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | NL | 01.11.2020 | [2023/15] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 21.10.2009 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MK | 10.06.2020 | ||
MT | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
TR | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
GB | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 22.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.10.2009 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MT | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
TR | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
GB | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 22.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
TR | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
GB | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 22.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
GB | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 22.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
GB | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
GB | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | |
NO | 10.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1403222 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]); | [Y]WO2006119052 (ANAEROBE SYSTEMS [US], et al); | [A]WO2008076423 (UNIV MARYLAND [US], et al); | [E]WO2010046913 (KIRLOSKAR INTEGRATED TECHNOLOG [IN], et al); | [E]WO2010046914 (KIRLOSKAR INTEGRATED TECHNOLOG [IN], et al); | International search | [A]US4022665 (GHOSH SAMBHUNATH, et al); | [Y]US2002162794 (TOCK RICHARD WILLIAM [US]); | by applicant | US20070944610 |