EP2355659 - FUSED HETEROCYCLIC M1 RECEPTOR POSITIVE ALLOSTERIC MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway NJ 07065-0907 / US | ||
Former [2011/33] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUDUK, Scott, D. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
DI MARCO, Christina, Ng 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [2011/33] | Representative(s) | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09822434.8 | 13.10.2009 | [2011/33] | WO2009US60403 | Priority number, date | US20080197096P | 23.10.2008 Original published format: US 197096 P | [2011/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010047990 | Date: | 29.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2355659 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/47, A61K31/4725, C07D401/06, C07D215/233, C07D405/06, C07D409/06, C07D413/06, C07D417/06, A61P25/28 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
C07D417/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D215/233 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07D409/06 (EP,US);
C07D413/06 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/33] | A01N43/42, A61K31/47 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/33] | Title | German: | FUSIONIERTE HETEROCYCLISCHE M1-REZEPTOR-POSITIVE ALLOSTERISCHE MODULATOREN | [2011/33] | English: | FUSED HETEROCYCLIC M1 RECEPTOR POSITIVE ALLOSTERIC MODULATORS | [2011/33] | French: | MODULATEURS DE RÉCEPTEUR M1 ALLOSTÉRIQUES POSITIFS HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES CONDENSÉS | [2011/33] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 22.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 29.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007067489 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * claim 31; compound 79 *; | [X]US2002099208 (YU KUO-LONG [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7,8,12,14 * compounds 179,180,181 * | International search | [Y]US7355047 (JOHNSTONE TIMOTHY B C [US], et al); | [Y]US7217724 (UENO YOSHIHIDE [JP], et al) | by applicant | WO2007067489 | WO2004073639 | - EGLEN ET AL., TRENDS IN PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (2001), vol. 22, no. 8, pages 409 - 414 | - FISHER, JPN J PHARMACOL, (2000), vol. 84, pages 101 - 112 | - SPALDING ET AL., MOL PHARMACOL, (2002), vol. 61, no. 6, pages 1297 - 1302 | - S. LAZARENO ET AL., MOL PHARMACOL, (2002), vol. 62, no. 6, pages 1491 - 1505 | - S. LAZARENO ET AL., MOL PHARMACOL, (2000), vol. 58, pages 194 - 207 | - PHARMACOL THER, (1993), vol. 58, pages 319 - 379 | - EUR J PHARMACOL, (1996), vol. 295, pages 93 - 102 | - MOL PHARMACOL, (2002), vol. 61, pages 1297 - 1302 | - BIRDSALL ET AL., LIFE SCIENCES, (2001), vol. 68, pages 2517 - 2524 | - CHRISTOPOULOS, NATURE REVIEWS: DRUG DISCOVERY, (2002), vol. 1, pages 198 - 210 |