EP2349501 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR BALL-HANDLING-SKILLS TRAINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elder, James C. 1011 Magnolia Drive Carrollton, TX 75007 / US | [2011/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/31] | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/31] | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09822612.9 | 21.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009US61451 | Priority number, date | US20080107524P | 22.10.2008 Original published format: US 107524 P | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010048267 | Date: | 29.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2349501 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A63B43/00, A63B69/00 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
A63B43/007 (EP,US);
A63B43/005 (EP,US);
A63B69/0086 (EP,US);
A63B2209/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | A63B43/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR BALLGESCHICKLICHKEITSTRAINING | [2011/31] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR BALL-HANDLING-SKILLS TRAINING | [2011/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE S'EXERCER AU MANIEMENT DU BALLON | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 15.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/50] | 03.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR2568478 (RACOWSKI ALAIN [FR]) [X] 1-3,6,8-12,14-16,18,20,22 * page 3, line 14 - page 6, line 29; figures 1-5 * [I] 4,5,7,13,17,19,21; | [A]US4121822 (DISABATINO BERNARD A, et al) [A] 1-22 * column 2, line 5 - column 4, line 13; figures 1-3 * | International search | [Y]US5280843 (VARTIJA SCOTT O [US], et al); | [Y]US4247117 (REICHERT PAUL W); | [Y]US4071241 (CORTES GARCIA JOSE DE JESUS); | [A]WO9913951 (JAMES ALAN LINDSAY [NZ]); | [A]US5443576 (HAUTER BRADLEY D [US]); | [A]US5358258 (KILLION DARRYL [US]) |