EP2337450 - METHODS FOR PRESERVING ENDOGENOUS TGF-BETA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MJN U.S. Holdings LLC 225 North Canal Street 25th Floor Chicago, Illinois 60606 / US | [2018/06] |
Former [2017/42] | For all designated states MJN U.S. Holdings LLC 225 North Canal Street 25th Floor Chicago, Illinois 60606 / US | ||
Former [2013/35] | For all designated states MJN U.S. Holdings LLC 2701 Patriot Boulevard 4th Floor Glenview, IL 60026 / US | ||
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states Mead Johnson Nutrition Company 2400 West Lloyd Expressway Evansville, IN 47721-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONZALEZ, Juan M. 6533 Cheshire Drive Newburgh, Indiana 47630 / US | 02 /
BANAVARA, Dattatreya 4055 Country Place Drive Evansville, Indiana 47714 / US | 03 /
ALVEY, John D. 10401 Knollsbrook Court Evansville, Indiana 47711 / US | [2011/26] | Representative(s) | Gill-Carey, Michael, et al Reckitt Benckiser, Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/06] | Gill-Carey, Michael, et al Reckitt Benckiser, Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Damson Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | ||
Former [2011/26] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09822753.1 | 23.10.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009US61783 | Priority number, date | US20080108264P | 24.10.2008 Original published format: US 108264 P | US20090370374 | 12.02.2009 Original published format: US 370374 | [2011/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010048474 | Date: | 29.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2337450 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2337450 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A23L33/00, A23L33/19 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
A23L33/19 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US);
A23V2300/46 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2300/46 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/26] | A01N25/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] |
Former [2011/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONSERVIERUNG VON ENDOGENEM TGF-BETA | [2011/26] | English: | METHODS FOR PRESERVING ENDOGENOUS TGF-BETA | [2011/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE CONSERVATION DE TGF-BÊTA ENDOGÈNE | [2011/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 01.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.12.2017 | 23.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.10.2009 | AT | 07.02.2018 | CY | 07.02.2018 | CZ | 07.02.2018 | DK | 07.02.2018 | EE | 07.02.2018 | FI | 07.02.2018 | HR | 07.02.2018 | LT | 07.02.2018 | LV | 07.02.2018 | MC | 07.02.2018 | MK | 07.02.2018 | PT | 07.02.2018 | RO | 07.02.2018 | SI | 07.02.2018 | SK | 07.02.2018 | SM | 07.02.2018 | TR | 07.02.2018 | BG | 07.05.2018 | GR | 08.05.2018 | IS | 07.06.2018 | IE | 23.10.2018 | LU | 23.10.2018 | MT | 23.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 23.10.2009 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
PT | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
TR | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
MT | 23.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
PT | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
TR | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
MT | 23.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
TR | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
MT | 23.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
MT | 23.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004102377 (PERRIN IRENE [CH], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0037] , [0038]; claim - *; | [A]US2007042021 (SCHIFFRIN EDUARDO [CH], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0020]; example 1 * | International search | [Y]US5681600 (ANTINONE MICHAEL JOSEPH [US], et al); | [Y]US5955136 (LAAMAN THOMAS R [US], et al); | [Y]US6733770 (GARCIA-RODENAS CLARA L [CH], et al) | Examination | - ELFSTRAND LIDIA ET AL, "Immunoglobulins, growth factors and growth hormone in bovine colostrum and the effects of processing", INTERNATIONAL DAIRY JOURNAL, ELSEVIER APPLIED SCIENCE, BARKING, GB, (20020101), vol. 12, no. 11, doi:10.1016/S0958-6946(02)00089-4, ISSN 0958-6946, pages 879 - 887, XP009073357 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-6946(02)00089-4 | - R Mahmoud ET AL, "FACTORS AFFECTING MEASUREMENT OF UNDENATURED WHEY PROTEIN NITROGEN IN DRIED WHEY BY A MODIFIED HARLAND-ASHWORTH TEST", JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE., US, (19900101), vol. 73, no. 7, ISSN 0022-0302, pages 1694 - 1699, XP055126508 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3168/jds.S0022-0302(90)78845-5 | by applicant | US5374567 | US5397591 | US5550156 | US6057430 | US6733770 | US7057016 |