EP2351832 - COMPOSITION FOR INDUCING TH2 CELL, THERAPEUTIC COMPOSITION FOR TH2-TYPE DISEASE, AND USE OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyogo College Of Medicine 1-1 Mukogawa-cho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 663-8501 / JP | [2011/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKANISHI, Kenji Hyogo College of Medicine, 1-1, Mukogawa-cho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 663-8501 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIMOTO, Tomohiro Hyogo College of Medicine, 1-1, Mukogawa-cho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 663-8501 / JP | [2011/33] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
NAKANISHI, Kenji Hyogo College of Medicine, 1-1, Mukogawa-cho, Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 663-8501 / JP | ||
02 /
YOSHIMOTO, Tomohiro Hyogo College of Medicine, 1-1, Mukogawa-cho, Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 663-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09823280.4 | 26.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009JP05625 | Priority number, date | JP20080281930 | 31.10.2008 Original published format: JP 2008281930 | [2011/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010050167 | Date: | 06.05.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2351832 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/07, A23K1/16, A61K39/395, A61K45/00, A61P1/00, A61P11/02, A61P11/06, A61P17/00, A61P27/02, A61P37/02, A61P37/08, A61P43/00, C07K14/54, C07K16/28, C12Q1/02, G01N33/15, G01N33/50, G01N33/53 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
G01N33/505 (EP,US);
A61K39/39583 (EP,US);
A61K47/6901 (EP,US);
A61K49/0008 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N5/0636 (EP,US);
C12N5/0642 (EP,US);
G01N33/5047 (EP,US);
G01N33/5088 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5158 (EP,US);
A61K2039/57 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6056 (EP,US);
C12N2502/11 (EP,US);
G01N2800/122 (EP,US);
G01N2800/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K39/39583, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMMENSETZUNG ZUR INDUKTION VON TH2-ZELLEN, THERAPEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR EINE TH2-TYP-KRANKHEIT UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2011/31] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR INDUCING TH2 CELL, THERAPEUTIC COMPOSITION FOR TH2-TYPE DISEASE, AND USE OF SAME | [2011/31] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR L'INDUCTION D'UN LYMPHOCYTE TH2, COMPOSITION THÉRAPEUTIQUE POUR LES MALADIES DE TYPE TH2, ET UTILISATION ASSOCIÉE | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2011 | Translation filed | 26.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 14.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/53] | 25.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/53] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - ZUBERI R I ET AL, "Role for IgE in airway secretions: IgE immune complexes are more potent inducers than antigen alone of airway inflammation in a murine model.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 1 MAR 2000 LNKD- PUBMED:10679107, (20000301), vol. 164, no. 5, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 2667 - 2673, XP002677851 [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 2667, column 2, line 30 - page 2668, column 1, line 3 * * page 2670, column 2, line 20 - page 2671, column 1, line 11 * * page 2668, column 1, line 58 - page 2668, column 2, line 42 * * page 2670, column 1, lines 9-15 * * page 2671, column 1, lines 47-50 * [Y] 4-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.164.5.2667 | [XY] - PIRRON U ET AL, "IgE-dependent antigen focusing by human B lymphocytes is mediated by the low-affinity receptor for IgE.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY JUL 1990 LNKD- PUBMED:2167225, (199007), vol. 20, no. 7, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 1547 - 1551, XP002677852 [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 1547, column 2, lines 34-36 * * page 1547, column 2, lines 18-41 * * page 1549, column 2, lines 27-30 * * page 1550, column 1, lines 19-21 * [Y] 4-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.1830200721 | [Y] - CAROLINE L SOKOL1 ET AL, "A mechanism for the initiation of allergen-induced T helper type 2 responses", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20080301), vol. 9, no. 3, doi:10.1038/NI1558, ISSN 1529-2908, pages 310 - 318, XP008147929 [Y] 4-17 * abstract * * page 310, column 2, lines 5-8 * * page 310, column 2, line 29 - page 311, column 1, line 6 * * page 314, column 1, lines 4-6 * * page 311, column 1, lines 12-16 * * page 311, column 2, lines 26-27 * * page 314, column 1, lines 13-15 * * page 316, column 1, lines 47-56 * * page 313, column 1, lines 20-24 * * page 315, column 1, lines 11-15 * * page 315, column 2, lines 6-11 * * page 316, column 1, line 12 * * page 316, column 1, lines 19-20 * * page 316, column 2, lines 14-53 * * page 317, column 1, lines 4-9 * * "Enzyme-linked immuno-absorbant assay" and "T cell culture"; page 317 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni1558 | [Y] - WEDEMEYER J ET AL, "Roles of mast cells and basophils in innate and acquired immunity", CURRENT OPINION IN IMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, (20001201), vol. 12, no. 6, doi:10.1016/S0952-7915(00)00154-0, ISSN 0952-7915, pages 624 - 631, XP004257734 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0952-7915(00)00154-0 | [Y] - SCHRAMM GABRIELE ET AL, "Cutting edge: IPSE/alpha-1, a glycoprotein from Schistosoma mansoni eggs, induces IgE-dependent, antigen-independent IL-4 production by murine basophils in vivo.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 15 MAY 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:17475824, (20070515), vol. 178, no. 10, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 6023 - 6027, XP002677853 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.178.10.6023 | [Y] - MUKAI KAORI ET AL, "Basophils play a critical role in the development of IgE-mediated chronic allergic inflammation independently of T cells and mast cells.", IMMUNITY AUG 2005 LNKD- PUBMED:16111637, (200508), vol. 23, no. 2, ISSN 1074-7613, pages 191 - 202, XP002677854 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.immuni.2005.06.011 | [Y] - PONCET P ET AL, "MHC class II-dependent activation of CD4+ T cell hybridomas by human mast cells through superantigen presentation.", JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY JUL 1999 LNKD- PUBMED:10410997, (199907), vol. 66, no. 1, ISSN 0741-5400, pages 105 - 112, XP002677855 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * | [Y] - LETOURNEUR F & KLAUSNER R D, "T-cell and basophil activation through the cytoplasmic tail of T-cell receptor zeta family proteins", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (19911001), vol. 88, doi:10.1073/PNAS.88.20.8905, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 8905 - 8909, XP002122779 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.88.20.8905 | [XP] - SOKOL CAROLINE L ET AL, "Basophils function as antigen-presenting cells for an allergen-induced T helper type 2 response.", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY JUL 2009 LNKD- PUBMED:19465907, (200907), vol. 10, no. 7, ISSN 1529-2916, pages 713 - 720, XP002677856 [XP] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NI.1738 | [XP] - YOSHIMOTO TOMOHIRO ET AL, "Basophils contribute to T(H)2-IgE responses in vivo via IL-4 production and presentation of peptide-MHC class II complexes to CD4+ T cells.", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY JUL 2009 LNKD- PUBMED:19465908, (200907), vol. 10, no. 7, ISSN 1529-2916, pages 706 - 712, XP002677857 [XP] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni.1737 | International search | [X]JP2008164523 (NIPPON MEDICAL SOKEN KK); | [X] - YUSUKE TSUJIMURA ET AL., "Koenkikyu no 21 Seiki Renaissance -Seitainai ni Okeru Koenkikyu no Unique na Yakuwari ga Zokuzoku to Akiraka ni", RINSHO KETSUEKI, (20080730), vol. 49, no. 7, pages 489 - 497, XP008147834 | [A] - SOKOL, CAROLINE, L. ET AL., "A mechanism for the initiation of allergen-induced T helper type 2 responses", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY, (200803), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 310 - 318, XP008147929 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni1558 | [A] - KOJIMA, T. ET AL., "Mast Cells and Basophils Are Selectively Activated In Vitro and In Vivo through CD200R3 in an IgE-Independent Mannerl", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (200711), vol. 179, pages 7093 - 7100, XP008147831 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.179.10.7093 | [A] - OBATA, K. ET AL., "Basophils are essential initiators of a novel type of chronic allergic inflammation", BLOOD, (200708), vol. 110, no. 3, pages 913 - 920, XP008147928 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2007-01-068718 | [A] - KENJI NAKANISHI, "Interleukin 18 to Allergy-sei Ensho", SOGO RINSHO, (200705), vol. 56, no. 5, pages 1827 - 1833, XP008147927 | Examination | - STEBBINGS RICHARD ET AL, "Cytokine Storm in the phase I trial of monoclonal antibody TGN1412: Better understanding the causes to improve preclinical testing of immunotherapeutics", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (20070901), vol. 179, no. 5, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 3325 - 3331, XP002559373 | - Marta Tufet, "T-cell activation: The waves behind the TGN1412 storm", Nature Reviews Immunology, (20080501), vol. 8, no. 5, doi:10.1038/nri2320, ISSN 1474-1733, pages 322 - 323, XP055174806 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nri2320 | by applicant | - GALLI, S. J., CURR OPIN HEMATOL, (2000), vol. 7, pages 32 - 9 | - GALLI, S. J. ET AL., ANNU REV IMMUNOL, (2005), vol. 23, pages 749 - 86 | - KAWAKAMI, T., GALLI, S. J., NAT REV IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 2, pages 773 - 86 | - MUKAI, K. ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2005), vol. 23, pages 191 - 202 | - MIN, B. ET AL., J EXP MED, (2004), vol. 200, pages 507 - 17 | - KONDO, Y. ET AL., INT IMMUNOL, (2008), vol. 20, pages 791 - 800 | - YOSHIMOTO, T. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1999), vol. 96, pages 13962 - 6 | - EISEN, H. N. ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1954), vol. 73, pages 296 - 308 |