EP2343413 - WALLPAPER AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Hausys, Ltd. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2011/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Cheng Zhe B-104, LG Staff Apt. Bongmyeong 2-dong Heungdeok-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 361-758 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Si Young 709-505, Booyeoung Apt. Jangja Maeul 275 Geumcheon-dong Sangdang-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 360-780 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Phan Seok 102-1205, Deokil Apt. Gagyeong-dong Heungdeok-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 361-738 / KR | [2011/28] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | Application number, filing date | 09823810.8 | 27.10.2009 | [2011/28] | WO2009KR06232 | Priority number, date | KR20080107230 | 30.10.2008 Original published format: KR 20080107230 | [2011/28] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010050730 | Date: | 06.05.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2343413 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | D21H27/20 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
D21H27/20 (EP,US);
D21H1/00 (KR);
B32B27/10 (US);
B32B27/308 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B32B3/10 (US);
D21H5/0082 (KR);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/251 (EP,US);
Y10T428/266 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31971 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31993 (EP,US);
Y10T442/674 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/28] | Title | German: | WANDZEITUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2011/28] | English: | WALLPAPER AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2011/28] | French: | PAPIER PEINT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2011/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2011 | Translation filed | 29.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 21.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/28] | 20.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0038884 (REED INT PLC [GB]) [Y] 4 * figures 1,2; example 3; claims 1-8 *[A] 1-3,5-17; | [XY]EP0564712 (SCHAEFER MARBURGER TAPETEN [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,12,14,15,17 * the whole document * [Y] 4; | [XY]WO9858798 (BIOTEC BIOLOG NATURVERPACK [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,11,12,15-17 * page 3, line 4 - page 12, line 23; claims 1-19 * [Y] 4; | [XY]EP1837363 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-15,17 * paragraphs [0009] - [0055] - [6210]; claims 1-28 * [Y] 4; | [XY]EP1944333 (UNITIKA LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-8,11-15 * paragraphs [0026] - [0052] - [0071]; claims 1-9 * [Y] 4 | International search | [X]JPH0647400U ; | [X]KR100280334B (JUN, HYO CHEOL); | [X]KR20020080054 (WALLFIN CO LTD [KR]) |