EP2351062 - MEASUREMENT AND ENDPOINTING OF SAMPLE THICKNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FEI Company 5350 NE Dawson Creek Drive Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | [2011/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Richard J. 16515 Sw Peninsula Ct Beaverton Oregon 97006 / US | 02 /
PETERSON, Brennan 2924 Ne 26th Ave Portland Oregon 97214 / US | 03 /
MORIARTY, Michael 880 NE 25th Suite 2 109 Hillsboro Oregon 97124 / US | 04 /
SCHAMPERS, Rudolf Johannes Peter Gerardus Gelrestraat 61 NL-5951 JE Belfeld / NL | [2011/39] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
YOUNG, Richard J. 16515 Sw Peninsula Ct Beaverton Oregon 97006 / US | ||
02 /
PETERSON, Brennan 2924 Ne 26th Ave Portland Oregon 97214 / US | |||
03 /
MORIARTY, Michael Apt 2201 3120 Nw John Olsen Rd Hillsboro Oregon 97124 / US | |||
04 /
SCHAMPERS, Rudolf Johannes Peter Gerardus Gelrestraat 61 NL-5951 JE Belfeld / NL | Representative(s) | Bakker, Hendrik FEI Company Patent Department P.O. Box 1745 5602 BS Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | Bakker, Hendrik FEI Company Patent Department P.O. Box 1745 5602 BS Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09824231.6 | 02.11.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009US63007 | Priority number, date | US20080110394P | 31.10.2008 Original published format: US 110394 P | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010051546 | Date: | 06.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2351062 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/304, H01J37/305, G01N1/28 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
H01J37/3056 (EP,US);
G01N1/286 (EP,US);
H01J37/304 (EP,US);
H01J2237/24455 (EP,US);
H01J2237/30466 (EP,US);
H01J2237/31745 (EP,US);
H01J2237/31749 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | H01J37/00, H01J37/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Title | German: | MESSUNG UND ENDPUNKTBESTIMMUNG VON PROBENDICKEN | [2011/31] | English: | MEASUREMENT AND ENDPOINTING OF SAMPLE THICKNESS | [2011/31] | French: | MESURE ET DÉTECTION DU POINT LIMITE DE L'ÉPAISSEUR D'UN ÉCHANTILLON | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 09.01.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 10.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.06.2015 | 19.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/47] | 10.07.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/47] | Divisional application(s) | EP11165381.2 / EP2367195 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2013 | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 30.01.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 30.01.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH085528 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-13,15-17* abstract *; | [A]US5525806 (IWASAKI KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13,15-17 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 52; figures 1, 2 * * column 5, line 48 - column 7, line 21; figure 4b *; | [Y]US5656811 (ITOH FUMIKAZU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8,10-13,15-17 * column col. 3, lines 44-66 * * column 9, lines 14-31; figure 12 * * column 13, line 62 - column 14, line 42; figure 25 *; | [YA]US2006097166 (ISHITANI TOHRU [JP], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0033] - [0043]; figures 1,4,5 * [A] 1-8,10-13,15-17; | [A] - Ludwig Reimer, "Scanning Electron Microscopy", Scanning Electron Microscopy, Berlin Heidelberg New York Tokyo, (19850101), ISBN 978-3-54-013530-2, XP055038522 [A] 1,17 * page 301 * | [Y] - WEISE J, "Messung des Materialtransports in dünnen Al-Filmen mit dem Raster-Elektronenmikroskop", BEITR. ELEKTRONENMIKROSKOP. DIREKTABB. OBERFL., (1971), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 477 - 488, XP009162881 [Y] 1-13,15-17 * pages 480-483 * | International search | [A]US2004129880 (OKOROANYANWU UZODINMA [US], et al); | [A]US2005184233 (PARK GYEONG-SU [KR], et al); | [A]US2003025087 (SCHAMBER FREDERICK [US], et al) | Examination | - "Lookup table", (20081130), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Lookup_table&oldid=255001897, (20131114), XP055088319 | by applicant | US5656811 | US5525806 | US2006097166 | JPH085528 | - LUDWIG REIMER, SCANNING ELECTRON MICROSCOPY |