EP2360561 - POSITION DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujikura, Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states Fujikura, Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOGURA, Takeshi c/o FUJIKURA LTD. SAKURA WORKS 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 02 /
SAKIYAMA, Koji c/o FUJIKURA LTD. SAKURA WORKS 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09826091.2 | 11.11.2009 | [2011/34] | WO2009JP69180 | Priority number, date | JP20080288973 | 11.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008288973 | [2011/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010055844 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2360561 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/044, G01B7/00, G01V3/08, G06F3/041, H03K17/955, G01D5/24, H03K17/96 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
H03K17/962 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/04166 (EP,KR,US);
G01D5/24 (EP,US);
G01D5/2405 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0444 (EP,KR,US);
H03K2017/9613 (EP,KR,US);
H03K2217/960715 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/34] | G06F3/044, G01B7/00, G01V3/08, G06F3/041, H03K17/955 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Title | German: | POSITIONSDETEKTOR | [2011/34] | English: | POSITION DETECTOR | [2011/34] | French: | DÉTECTEURS DE POSITION | [2011/34] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2011 | Translation filed | 06.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 01.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/45] | 24.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07270541 (AISIN SEIKI) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [Y]US6326564 (KOMATSU YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 13-17 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005253712 (KIMURA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0079]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JP2006145488 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [XY]US2006250142 (ABE HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 11,12,18 * figures 2A,2B * [Y] 13-17; | [X]JP2006341733 (HONDA ELESYS CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]JP2007303895 (FUJIKURA LTD) [A] 4-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US2008093925 (KOBAYASHI TAKESHI [JP]) [X] 1-3 * figure 1A * | International search | [A]JP2005337773 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JP2006285518 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2006527438 (BINSTEAD, RONALD, PETER); | [Y]JP2008117371 (SONY CORP) | by applicant | JPH0864364 | JP2006177838 |