EP2353404 - MALT EXTRACT AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states San-Ei Gen F.F.I., INC. 1-1-11, Sanwa-cho Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 561-8588 / JP | [2011/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIGASHIMURA, Yutaka c/o SAN-EI GEN F.F.I. INC. 1-1-11 Sanwa-cho Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-8588 / JP | 02 /
KURIHARA, Kenta c/o SAN-EI GEN F.F.I. INC. 1-1-11 Sanwa-cho Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-8588 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Keiko c/o SAN-EI GEN F.F.I. INC. 1-1-11 Sanwa-cho Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-8588 / JP | 04 /
MAEDA, Chika c/o SAN-EI GEN F.F.I. INC. 1-1-11 Sanwa-cho Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-8588 / JP | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09826194.4 | 17.11.2009 | [2011/32] | WO2009JP69508 | Priority number, date | JP20080293925 | 17.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008293925 | [2011/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010055949 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2353404 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/27, A23L2/58 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
A23L2/58 (EP,US);
A23L2/68 (EP,US);
A23L2/72 (EP,US);
A23L5/43 (EP,US);
A23L7/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Title | German: | MALZEXTRAKT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/32] | English: | MALT EXTRACT AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2011/32] | French: | EXTRAIT DE MALTE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2011/32] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2011 | Translation filed | 19.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 20.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/21] | 03.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008044530 (MCCORMICK CASEY [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * page 2, paragraph [0014]; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0188882 (WHITBREAD & CO LTD [GB]) [X] 1-6,12-14 * page 1, line 18 - line 31; example -; claims 1,5 *; | [X]US4528198 (MIZERAK ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1-6,12-14 * column 5, line 50 - line 54; examples 1,2 *; | [X]DE4234392 (ANNEMUELLER GEROLF DR [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,12-14 * page 3, paragraph 2; example -; claim - *; | [X]GB2263856 (PAULS MALT LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1-6,12-14 * page 1, line 25 - page 4, line 31; figure 1; claim - *; | [X]WO9903363 (EDME LIMITED [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,12-14 * page 2, line 16 - line 17; figure 1; claim - * | [X] - CBS, "Maltex high purity data sheet", (20080308), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20080308151841/http://www.cbsbrew.com/Fiches/Fiches_html/Maltex.html, (20120329), XP002672618 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS6467173 (SANEI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) | [Y] - STARES, KW., "Malt Extract Stability Study", FOOD PROCESS (TONBRIDGE), (198801), vol. 57, no. 1, page 10, 13, XP008139981 | [Y] - LAVERS BILL, "The myriad uses of malt", FOOD INGRED ANAL INT, (200611), vol. 28, no. 6, pages 6 - 7 | by applicant | JP2003250503 | JPS63501193 | JP2004350570 | JPH11266809 |