EP2356551 - INTEGRATED TOUCH-SENSING DISPLAY APPARATUS AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FlatFrog Laboratories AB Traktorvägen 11 226 60 Lund / SE | [2011/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WASSVIK, Ola Snogeréd Brostorp 112 S-243 95 Höör / SE | 02 /
CHRISTIANSSON, Tomas Prästvägen 8 S-247 45 Torna-Hällestad / SE | [2011/33] | Representative(s) | KIPA AB P O Box 1065 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Davies, Dominic Jack, et al FlatFrog Laboratories AB Patent Traktorvägen 11 226 60 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2014/18] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2013/46] | Brann AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2011/33] | Mannerlöf Tenning, Eva Marie Brann AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 09826361.9 | 12.11.2009 | [2011/33] | WO2009SE00492 | Priority number, date | SE20080002383 | 12.11.2008 Original published format: SE 0802383 | US20080193275P | 12.11.2008 Original published format: US 193275 P | [2011/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010056177 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2356551 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/042, G06F3/041 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
G06F3/042 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/429 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/13338 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0304 (KR);
G06F3/0412 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0428 (EP,KR,US);
G06F2203/04109 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/33] | G06F3/042 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/33] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE BERÜHRUNGSEMPFINDLICHE ANZEIGE UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/33] | English: | INTEGRATED TOUCH-SENSING DISPLAY APPARATUS AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SAME | [2011/33] | French: | APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE TACTILE INTÉGRÉ ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2011/33] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 17.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 15.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/14] | 18.11.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDYI]WO2007058924 (PLANAR SYSTEMS INC [US]; DEN BOER WILLEM [US]; ABILEAH ADIEL [US]) [XD] 1,2,7-9,14,15 * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [00141]; figures 5,17,26,37 * [Y] 3-5,12 [I] 6,10,11,13; | [Y]EP1288848 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [Y] 3-5 * paragraph [0036] *; | [Y]US2008122803 (IZADI SHAHRAM [GB] ET AL) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0112] * * figure 5 *; | [A]WO2007112742 (TAKTIO AS [DK]; OESTERGAARD JENS WAGENBLAST ST [DK]; ELIASSON JONAS OV) [A] 1-15 * page 32, line 28 - page 33, line 2; figure 8 *; | [A]WO2006134552 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; VAN BERKEL CORNELIS [GB]; BATEMAN) [A] 1-15 * page 10, line 18 - page 11, line 13; figure 5 * | International search | [A]US2008029691 (J.Y. HAN); | [A]US2008266266 (J.C. KENT ET AL); | [A]US2007125937 (J.O.P. ELIASSON ET AL); | [A]US2003016450 (V. BLUEMEL ET AL); | [A]WO2005114369 (APPLE COMPUTER, INC.) |