EP2349479 - NEAR-INFRARED ELECTROMAGNETIC MODIFICATION OF CELLULAR STEADY-STATE MEMBRANE POTENTIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nomir Medical Technologies, Inc 307 Waverly Oaks Road, Suite 109 Waltham, MA 02452 / US | [2015/35] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Nomir Medical Technologies, Inc 307 Waverly Oaks Road, Suite 109 Waltham, MA 02452 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORNSTEIN, Eric 232 Pond Road Natick, Massachusetts 01760 / US | 02 /
WLASSICH, John 3021 Avenue J Brooklyn, New York 11210 / US | [2011/37] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
BORNSTEIN, Eric 232 Pond Road Natick, Massachusetts 01760 / US | ||
02 /
WLASSICH, John 307 Waverley Oaks Road Suite 109 Waltham, Massachusetts 02452 / US | Representative(s) | Cowley, Catherine Mary, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Murphy, Colm Damien, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2011/31] | Murphy, Colm Damien, et al Ipulse 9-10 Savile Row London W1S 3PF / GB | Application number, filing date | 09826549.9 | 29.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009US62533 | Priority number, date | US20080109385P | 29.10.2008 Original published format: US 109385 P | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010056537 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2349479 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2349479 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
A61N5/0624 (EP,US);
A61N5/0616 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00988 (EP,US);
A61B2018/20361 (EP,US);
A61B2018/207 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0628 (EP,US);
A61N2005/063 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0643 (US);
A61N2005/0644 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2011/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE NAHINFRAROTÄNDERUNG VON STATIONÄREM ZELLMEMBRANPOTENZIAL | [2011/31] | English: | NEAR-INFRARED ELECTROMAGNETIC MODIFICATION OF CELLULAR STEADY-STATE MEMBRANE POTENTIALS | [2011/31] | French: | MODIFICATION ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE DANS L'INFRAROUGE PROCHE DE POTENTIELS DE MEMBRANE CELLULAIRE À L'ÉTAT STATIONNAIRE | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 10.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15177402.3 / EP2995346 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.09.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 06.09.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.09.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2009 | AT | 26.08.2015 | BE | 26.08.2015 | BG | 26.08.2015 | CY | 26.08.2015 | CZ | 26.08.2015 | DK | 26.08.2015 | EE | 26.08.2015 | ES | 26.08.2015 | FI | 26.08.2015 | HR | 26.08.2015 | LT | 26.08.2015 | LV | 26.08.2015 | MC | 26.08.2015 | MK | 26.08.2015 | MT | 26.08.2015 | PL | 26.08.2015 | RO | 26.08.2015 | SE | 26.08.2015 | SI | 26.08.2015 | SK | 26.08.2015 | SM | 26.08.2015 | TR | 26.08.2015 | LU | 29.10.2015 | NO | 26.11.2015 | GR | 27.11.2015 | IS | 26.12.2015 | PT | 28.12.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 29.10.2009 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
BG | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 29.10.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 29.10.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 29.10.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 29.10.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 29.10.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 26.08.2015 | |
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 26.08.2015 | |
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 26.08.2015 | |
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 26.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004030325 (CAHIR NICHOLAS [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11* paragraphs [0012] , [0036] , [0038]; figures 1-4 * | International search | [X]US2004030325 (CAHIR NICHOLAS [GB], et al); | [Y]US2007167943 (JANSSEN WILLIAM M [US], et al); | [Y]US2007219600 (GERTNER MICHAEL [US], et al) | by applicant | US2004030325 |