EP2352961 - A FURNACE AND A METHOD FOR COOLING A FURNACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xstrata Technology Pty Ltd Level 4 307 Queen Street Brisbane, QLD 4000 / AU | [2011/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOUBERT, Hugo 25 Georgia Place The Gap Queensland 4061 / AU | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09827034.1 | 13.11.2009 | [2011/32] | WO2009AU01481 | Priority number, date | AU20080905983 | 19.11.2008 Original published format: AU 2008905983 | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010057245 | Date: | 27.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2352961 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 27.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F27D1/00, F27B1/24, F27D1/12, C21B7/06, F27D1/04, F27B1/14, F27D1/06 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
F27B1/14 (EP,US);
F27D1/12 (EP,KR,US);
C21B7/06 (EP,KR,US);
C21C5/4646 (EP,US);
F27B1/24 (EP,KR,US);
F27D1/0006 (EP,US);
F27D1/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Title | German: | MÖBELSTÜCK UND VERFAHREN ZUR KÜHLUNG EINES MÖBELSTÜCKS | [2011/32] | English: | A FURNACE AND A METHOD FOR COOLING A FURNACE | [2011/32] | French: | FOUR ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE REFROIDISSEMENT D'UN FOUR | [2011/32] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 11.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 15.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2014 | Observations by third parties | 25.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 03.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3953007 (VAN LAAR JACOBUS) [X] 1,3-5,7-9 * figure 1 * * abstract * * claim 1 *[I] 2,6,10; | [XI]WO9832883 (HOOGOVENS STAAL BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-9 * claims 1,10,11 * * figure 1 * [I] 2,6,10; | [XI]US5811057 (HUBBLE DAVID H [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-10 * figures 1, 5, 8, 9 * * table 1 * [I] 2,6 | International search | [Y]US3953007 (VAN LAAR JACOBUS); | [X]US5811057 (HUBBLE DAVID H [US], et al); | [A]JP2000017313 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) |