EP2350266 - METHOD FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING A PANCREATIC DYSFUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mesoblast, Inc. 505 Fifth Avenue Third Floor New York, NY 10017 / US | [2015/50] |
Former [2012/21] | For all designated states Mesoblast, Inc. 275 Madison Avenue 4th Floor New York NY 10016 / US | ||
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Angioblast Systems, Inc. 275 Madison Avenue 4th Floor New York, New York 10016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITESCU, Silviu Level 39, 55 Collins Street Melbourne Victoria 3000 / AU | 02 /
KRISHNAN, Ravi 63 Battams Road Royston Park South Australia 5070 / AU | [2011/31] | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/31] | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09827049.9 | 19.11.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009AU01511 | Priority number, date | US20080199796P | 20.11.2008 Original published format: US 199796 P | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010057260 | Date: | 27.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2350266 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2350266 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 27.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/077, A61P1/18, A61P5/48, A61K35/12, A61K35/39, C12N5/02 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
A61K35/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/545 (US);
A61K35/39 (KR);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (KR);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
C12N5/0676 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/66 (US);
G01N33/6893 (US);
G01N33/74 (US);
G01N2333/47 (US);
G01N2333/62 (US);
G01N2800/042 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] |
Former [2011/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER VERHINDERUNG EINER PANKREAS-DYSFUNKTION | [2011/31] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING A PANCREATIC DYSFUNCTION | [2011/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR TRAITER OU PRÉVENIR UN DYSFONCTIONNEMENT PANCRÉATIQUE | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 22.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15178550.8 / EP3002329 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.11.2009 | AT | 29.07.2015 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | CZ | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | HR | 29.07.2015 | LT | 29.07.2015 | LV | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | MK | 29.07.2015 | MT | 29.07.2015 | PL | 29.07.2015 | RO | 29.07.2015 | SE | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | SK | 29.07.2015 | SM | 29.07.2015 | TR | 29.07.2015 | NO | 29.10.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | LU | 19.11.2015 | IS | 29.11.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 19.11.2009 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
LU | 19.11.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
LU | 19.11.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
LU | 19.11.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 29.07.2015 | |
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 29.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2004016747 (UNIV FLORIDA [US]) [I] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2007127408 (TULANE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SCIEN [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * figure 1; example 1 *; | [I] - EZQUER F E ET AL, "Systemic Administration of Multipotent Mesenchymal Stromal Cells Reverts Hyperglycemia and Prevents Nephropathy in Type 1 Diabetic Mice", BIOLOGY OF BLOOD AND MARROW TRANSPLANTATION, KLUGE CARDEN JENNINGS PUBLISHING, CHARLOTTESVILLE, VA, US, vol. 14, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.BBMT.2008.01.006, ISSN 1083-8791, (20080601), pages 631 - 640, (20080414), XP022668419 [I] 1-14 * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbmt.2008.01.006 | [I] - TIMPER K ET AL, "Human adipose tissue-derived mesenchymal stem cells differentiate into insulin, somatostatin, and glucagon expressing cells", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, vol. 341, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2006.01.072, ISSN 0006-291X, (20060324), pages 1135 - 1140, (20060324), XP024923809 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2006.01.072 | [I] - LEE RYANG HWA ET AL, "Multipotent stromal cells from human marrow home to and promote repair of pancreatic islets and renal glomeruli in diabetic NOD/scid mice", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (20061101), vol. 103, no. 46, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0608249103, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 17438 - 17443, XP002459835 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0608249103 | [A] - STAN GRONTHOS ET AL, A Method to Isolate and Purify Human Bone Marrow Stromal Stem Cells, MESENCHYMAL STEM CELLS : METHODS AND PROTOCOLS; [METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY], TOTOWA, NJ : HUMANA PRESS, US, PAGE(S) 45 - 57, (20080401), ISBN 978-1-58829-771-6, XP008144677 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-1-60327-169-1_3 | International search | [X]WO2006032092 (ANGIOBLAST SYSTEMS INC [US], et al); | [Y] - EZQUER, F. E. ET AL., "Systemic Administration of Multipotent Mesenchymal Stromal Cells Reverts Hyperglycemia and Prevents Nephropathy in Type 1 Diabetic Mice", BIOLOGY OF BLOOD AND MARROW TRANSPLANTATION., (200806), vol. 14, no. 6, pages 631 - 640, XP022668419 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbmt.2008.01.006 | [Y] - LEE, R. H. ET AL., "'Multipotent stromal cells from human marrow home to and promote repair of pancreatic islets and renal glomeruli in diabetic NOD/scid mice", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA., (2006), vol. 103, no. 46, pages 17438 - 17443, XP002459835 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0608249103 | [Y] - OH, S-H. ET AL., "Adult bone marrow-derived cells trans-differentiating into insulin-producing cells for the treatment of type I diabetes", LABORATORY INVESTIGATION., (2004), vol. 84, pages 607 - 617, XP008146969 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/labinvest.3700074 | [Y] - GRONTHOS, S. ET AL., "'Molecular and cellular characterisation of highly purified stromal stem cells derived from human bone marrow", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE., (2003), vol. 116, pages 1827 - 1835, XP009083626 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/jcs.00369 | [Y] - KOLF, C. M. ET AL., "Mesenchymal stromal cells. Biology of adult mesenchymal stem cells: regulation of niche, self-renewal and differentiation", ARTHRITIS RESEARCH & THERAPY., (2007), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 204 - 211, XP008146968 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/ar2116 | [A] - LIU, M. ET AL., "Mesenchymal stem cells: biology and clinical potential in type 1 diabetes therapy", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR MEDICINE., (200808), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 1155 - 1168, XP002541175 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1582-4934.2008.00288.x | by applicant | WO9201070 | US5139941 | US5173414 | WO9303769 | WO0104268 | WO0114268 | WO2004085630 | WO2006032092 | - BABU ET AL., MOL ENDOCRINOL., (2006), vol. 20, pages 3133 - 3145 | - BUTEAU, DIABETES AND METABOLISM, (2008), vol. 34, pages S73 - S77 | - SHAPIRO ET AL., NEW ENG. J. MED., (2000), vol. 343, pages 230 - 238 | - BURNS ET AL., J. ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2004), vol. 103, pages 437 - 443 | - KAHN ET AL., AM. J. MED., (2000), vol. 108, pages 2S - 8S | - SAMBROOK; FRITSCH; MANIATIS, Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORIES, (1989), vol. I, II | - DNA Cloning: A Practical Approach, IRL PRESS, (1985), vol. I, II | - J.F. RAMALHO ORTIGAO, "The Chemistry of Peptide Synthesis", KNOWLEDGE DATABASE OF ACCESS TO VIRTUAL LABORATORY WEBSITE (INTERACTIVA, GERMANY | - SAKAKIBARA, D.; TEICHMAN, J.; LIEN, E.; FENICHEL, R.L., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1976), vol. 73, pages 336 - 342 | - MERRIFIELD, R.B., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1963), vol. 85, pages 2149 - 2154 | - BARANY, G.; MERRIFIELD, R.B., The Peptides, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1979), vol. 2, pages 1 - 284 | - Synthese von Peptiden in Houben-Weyls Metoden der Organischen Chemie, THIEME, (1974), vol. 15 | - BODANSZKY, M., INT. J. PEPTIDE PROTEIN RES., (1985), vol. 25, pages 449 - 474 | - Handbook of Experimental Immunology, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, (1986), vol. I-IV | - GRONTHOS ET AL., BLOOD, (1995), vol. 85, pages 929 - 940 | - BUCHSCHER ET AL., J VIROL., (1992), vol. 56, pages 2731 - 2739 | - JOHANN ET AL., J. VIROL., (1992), vol. 65, pages 1635 - 1640 | - SOMMERFELT ET AL., VIROL., (1990), vol. 76, pages 58 - 59 | - WILSON ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 274 - 2318 | - MILLER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1991), vol. 65, pages 2220 - 2224 | - MILLER; ROSMAN, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1989), vol. 7, pages 980 - 990 | - MILLER, A. D, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1990), vol. 7, pages 5 - 14 | - SCARPA ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1991), vol. 75, pages 849 - 852 | - BURNS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 8033 - 8037 | - LEBKOWSKI ET AL., MOLEC. CELL. BIOL., (1988), vol. 5, pages 3988 - 3996 | - VINCENT ET AL., Vaccines, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1990), page 90 | - CARTER, CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 5, pages 533 - 539 | - MUZYCZKA, CURRENT TOPICS IN MICROBIOL, AND IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 158, pages 97 - 129 | - KOTIN, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 793 - 801 | - SHELLING; SMITH, GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 7, pages 165 - 169 | - ZHOU ET AL., J EXP. MED., (1994), vol. 179, pages 1867 - 1875 | - FISHER-HOCH ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 56, pages 317 - 321 | - LÚKIC ET AL., DEVELOPMENTAL IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 6, pages 119 - 128 | - ARULMOZHI ET AL., INDIAN J. PHARMACOL., (2004), vol. 36, pages 217 - 221 | - REES; ALCOLADO, DIABET. MED., (2005), vol. 22, pages 359 - 70 | - CARAWAY, AM. J. CLIN. PATHOL., (1959), vol. 32, pages 97 - 99 | - RINDERKNECHT; MARBACH, CLIN. CHEM. ACTA, (1972), vol. 29, pages 107 - 110 | - CONNON ET AL., DIGESTIVE DISEASES AND SCIENCES, (1978), vol. 23, pages 472 - 475 | - VACANTI ET AL., J. PED. SURG., (1988), vol. 23, pages 3 - 9 | - CIMA ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (1991), vol. 38, page 145 | - VACANTI ET AL., PLAST. RECONSTR. SURG., (1991), vol. 88, pages 753 - 9 | - BOTTAZZO ET AL., LANCET, (1974), vol. 2, pages 1279 - 83 | - BROOKING ET AL., CLIN CHIM ACTA, (2003), vol. 331, pages 55 - 59 | - NAGATA ET AL., ANN. NEW YORK ACAD. SCI, (2004), vol. 1037, pages 10 - 15 | - GRONTHOS; ZANNETINO, METHODS MOL BIOL., (2008), vol. 449, pages 45 - 57 | - ZHOU ET AL., NATURE, (2008), vol. 455, pages 627 - 632 | - LIU ET AL., MOL THER, (2007), vol. 15, pages 86 - 93 | - WANG ET AL., DIABETES, (1998), vol. 47, pages 50 - 6 | - KIM ET AL., DIABETES, (2001), vol. 50, pages 1562 - 1570 | - MU ET AL., DIABETES, (2006), vol. 55, pages 1695 - 1704 | - TOURRELL ET AL., DIABETES, (2001), vol. 50, pages 1562 - 1570 | - LI ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2003), vol. 278, pages 471 - 478 | - GEZGINCI-OKTAYOGLU; BOLKENT, BIOCHEM CELL BIOL, (2009), vol. 87, pages 641 - 651 | WO1994US05700 |