EP2360716 - PLASMA PROCESSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evatech Co., Ltd. 188 Oaza-Mori Koaza-Ouchi Kumiyama-cho Kuze-gun Kyoto 613-0024 / JP | [2011/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INO, Eiji c/o EVATECH Co. Ltd. 188 Oaza-Mori Koaza-Ouchi Kumiyama-cho Kuze-gun Kyoto 613-0024 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Akira c/o EVATECH Co. Ltd. 188 Oaza-Mori Koaza-Ouchi Kumiyama-cho Kuze-gun Kyoto 613-0024 / JP | 03 /
ISHIHARA, Shunichi c/o EVATECH Co. Ltd. 188 Oaza-Mori Koaza-Ouchi Kumiyama-cho Kuze-gun Kyoto 613-0024 / JP | 04 /
ASHIDA, Hajime c/o EVATECH Co. Ltd. 188 Oaza-Mori Koaza-Ouchi Kumiyama-cho Kuze-gun Kyoto 613-0024 / JP | 05 /
SHOJI, Hiroshi c/o EVATECH Co. Ltd. 188 Oaza-Mori Koaza-Ouchi Kumiyama-cho Kuze-gun Kyoto 613-0024 / JP | 06 /
YOSHIMURA, Keiichi c/o EVATECH Co. Ltd. 188 Oaza-Mori Koaza-Ouchi Kumiyama-cho Kuze-gun Kyoto 613-0024 / JP | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Hehl, Ulrich, et al Klostersteige 36 87435 Kempten / DE | [2011/34] | Application number, filing date | 09827341.0 | 17.11.2009 | [2011/34] | WO2009JP06168 | Priority number, date | JP20080297335 | 20.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008297335 | [2011/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010058560 | Date: | 27.05.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2360716 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/205, C23C16/509, H01L31/04 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
C23C16/45578 (EP,US);
C23C16/509 (EP,US);
H01J37/3244 (EP,US);
H01J37/32568 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLASMAVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2011/34] | English: | PLASMA PROCESSING APPARATUS | [2011/34] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT PAR PLASMA | [2011/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2011 | Translation filed | 20.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 19.11.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH0837097 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JP2003188104 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [X]WO2008123295 (MITSUI SHIPBUILDING ENG [JP], et al); | [X]JP2008235611 (UNIV TOHOKU, et al); | [A]JP2004143592 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) | by applicant | JP2001291882 | JP2004281230 |