EP2359594 - DYNAMIC APPLICATION INSERTION FOR MPEG STREAM SWITCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FourthWall Media, Inc. 21240 Ridgetop Circle, Suite 140 Sterling, VA 20166 / US | [2011/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLOTHOUBER, Louis, P. 702 Chimney Court NE Leesburg Virginia 20176 / US | 02 /
YE, Aaron 43607 Dunhill Cup Square Ashburn Virginia 20147 / US | 03 /
KOTMEL, Jr., Allan, V. 709 Southview Place, NE Leesburg Virginia 20176 / US | 04 /
BROWN, Marco, J. 10102 Ebenshire Court Oakton Virginia 22124 / US | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2011/34] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road GB-London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 09828229.6 | 19.11.2009 | [2011/34] | WO2009US65169 | Priority number, date | US20080116204P | 19.11.2008 Original published format: US 116204 P | [2011/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010059841 | Date: | 27.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2359594 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/235, H04N21/2668, H04N21/434, H04N21/435, H04N21/443, H04N21/438, H04N21/466, H04N21/658, H04N21/44, H04N21/81 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N7/12 (KR);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/2668 (EP,US);
H04N21/4349 (EP,US);
H04N21/4383 (EP,US);
H04N21/44016 (EP,US);
H04N21/4438 (EP,US);
H04N21/4667 (EP,US);
H04N21/6582 (EP,US);
H04N21/818 (EP,US);
H04N7/08 (KR);
H04N7/0806 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/34] | H04N7/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE ANWENDUNGSEINFÜGUNG FÜR MPEG-STREAMWECHSEL | [2011/34] | English: | DYNAMIC APPLICATION INSERTION FOR MPEG STREAM SWITCHING | [2011/34] | French: | INSERTION D'APPLICATION DYNAMIQUE POUR COMMUTATION DE FLUX MPEG | [2011/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 17.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.05.2020 | 04.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/50] | 02.08.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9955090 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 16 - page 6, line 30 * * page 8, line 17 - line 20 * * page 9, line 15 - page 13, line 5 *; | [A]WO02104020 (DIGEO INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * pages 4-13,16 * * page 17 *; | [A]WO2005031524 (CONCRETE PICTURES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [YA]US2006130120 (BRANDYBERRY DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,8,14 * paragraphs [0001] - [0026] * [A] 1,2,5-7,9-13,15; | [IY]US2007079325 (DE HEER DAVID L [US]) [I] 1,2,5-7,9-13,15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0020] - [0 24] - [0026] - [0030] , [0034] , [0036] , [0039] , [0044] - [0047]; figure 1 * [Y] 3,4,8,14; | [A] - Opencable, "Enhanced TV Operational Guidelines", (20060714), pages 1 - 56, URL: http://www.cablelabs.com/specifications/OC-GL-ETV-OG-V01-060714.pdf, (20130510), XP055062461 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - Cable Television Laboratories,, "Cable Labs ETV and API Demo", (20061026), pages 1 - 15, URL: http://www.cablelabs.com/opencable/downloads/ETV-DPI-102606v11.pdf, (20130510), XP055062475 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - Cable Television Laboratories ET AL, "Enhanced TV Application Messaging Protocol 1.0", (20070921), URL: http://www.cablelabs.com/specifications/OC-SP-ETV-AM1.0-I04-070921.pdf, (20130510), XP055062485 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2002024967 (ZAUN DAVID BRIAN [US], et al); | [Y]US6481012 (GORDON DONALD F [US], et al); | [Y]US2006107302 (ZDEPSKI JOEL [US]); | [Y]US2006130120 (BRANDYBERRY DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US2008175148 (TODD MARC A C [US], et al) | by applicant | US2007079325 |