EP2351791 - RESIN COMPOSITION FOR PLATING USE AND RESIN PLATED PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UMG ABS, Ltd. 8-1, Akashi-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-6591 / JP | [2011/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAI, Hiroshi c/o UMG ABS LTD. Ube Factory 525-14, Oaza Okiube Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8580 / JP | 02 /
YAMASHITA, Shinji c/o UMG ABS LTD. Ube Factory 525-14, Oaza Okiube Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8580 / JP | [2011/31] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | Application number, filing date | 09828855.8 | 26.11.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009JP06388 | Priority number, date | JP20080302399 | 27.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008302399 | [2011/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010061605 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2351791 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08L51/04, C08K5/00, C08L25/12, C25D5/56 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
C08C1/065 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08L25/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08L55/02 (KR);
C25D5/56 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/005 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L25/12, C08L55/02 (US,EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/02 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR PLATTIERUNGSZWECKE UND PLATTIERTES HARZPRODUKT | [2011/31] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION FOR PLATING USE AND RESIN PLATED PRODUCT | [2011/31] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE UTILISÉE COMME REVÊTEMENT, ET PRODUIT RECOUVERT DE RÉSINE | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2011 | Translation filed | 17.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 26.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 05.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0716101 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-3* examples 1-3 *; | [XP]WO2009025334 (UMG ABS LTD [JP], et al) [XP] 1-3 * example 90 * | International search | [A]JPH10130485 (TECHNO POLYMER KK); | [A]JP2000190328 (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD); | [A]JP2003082138 (DAICEL POLYMER LTD); | [A]JP2005298899 (OKUNO CHEM IND CO); | [A]JP2007161940 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2008013731 (UMG ABS LTD) | by applicant | JPH01161425 | JPH0711487 | JP2005336614 | JP2007100174 | JP2007327131 | JP2008031513 | JP2008302399 |