EP2352118 - IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE, METHOD FOR DISPLAYING IMAGE AND INFORMATION STORING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2016/24] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Incorporated 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states SNE Platform Inc. 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUDA, Munetaka c/o Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 1080075 / JP | 02 /
MATONO, Yoshinobu c/o Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 1080075 / JP | 03 /
HIRABAYASHI, Masato c/o Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 1080075 / JP | [2017/33] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
TSUDA, Munetaka c/o Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 1080075 / JP | ||
02 /
MATONO, Yoshinobu c/o Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 1080075 / JP | |||
03 /
HIRABAYASHI, Masato c/o Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 1080075 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/31] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09828911.9 | 30.06.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009JP61941 | Priority number, date | JP20080299850 | 25.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008299850 | JP20080299851 | 25.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008299851 | JP20080299852 | 25.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008299852 | JP20080299853 | 25.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008299853 | [2011/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010061661 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2352118 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2352118 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/00, G06F3/048, G06F17/30 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
G06F3/04815 (EP,US);
G06F16/50 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
G06T11/60 (EP,US);
G06T15/20 (US);
G06F2203/04806 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/33] |
Former [2011/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG, BILDANZEIGEVERFAHREN UND INFORMATIONSSPEICHERMEDIUM | [2011/31] | English: | IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE, METHOD FOR DISPLAYING IMAGE AND INFORMATION STORING MEDIUM | [2011/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGES, PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE D'UNE IMAGE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE D'INFORMATION | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2010 | Translation filed | 21.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2010 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 04.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2009 | AT | 16.08.2017 | CY | 16.08.2017 | CZ | 16.08.2017 | DK | 16.08.2017 | EE | 16.08.2017 | ES | 16.08.2017 | FI | 16.08.2017 | HR | 16.08.2017 | IT | 16.08.2017 | LT | 16.08.2017 | LV | 16.08.2017 | MC | 16.08.2017 | MK | 16.08.2017 | NL | 16.08.2017 | PL | 16.08.2017 | PT | 16.08.2017 | RO | 16.08.2017 | SE | 16.08.2017 | SI | 16.08.2017 | SK | 16.08.2017 | TR | 16.08.2017 | BG | 16.11.2017 | NO | 16.11.2017 | GR | 17.11.2017 | IS | 16.12.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 30.06.2009 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
HR | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 30.06.2009 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 16.08.2017 | |
NO | 16.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007109598 (CLARK TIMOTHY P [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2007223040 (NONAKA SHUNICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0063]; figures 3-5 *; | [X]EP1962175 (YAPPA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0028]; figures 7-9 * * paragraph [0033]; figure 13 *; | [A] - DRUCKER S ET AL, "MediaBrowser: reclaiming the shoebox", PROCEEDINGS OF THE WORKSHOP ON ADVANCED VISUAL INTERFACES AVI, XX, XX, (20040525), doi:10.1145/989863.989944, pages 433 - 436, XP002491964 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/989863.989944 | International search | [A]JPH0584219 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [X]WO0033571 (SONY CORP [JP], et al); | [X]JP2005031830 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005032219 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2006172090 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X]JP2007509403 (MICROSOFT CORP.); | [Y]JP2007193592 (KONICA MINOLTA PHOTO IMAGING) | by applicant | EP1923835 |