EP2380673 - DEVICE FOR CORRECTING PIPE-END SHAPE OF UOE METALLIC PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2019/25] |
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | ||
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states Sumitomo Metal Industries Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABE, Makoto c/o Sumitomo Metal Industries Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 02 /
IKEDA, Tomoaki c/o Sumitomo Metal Industries Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09828993.7 | 16.11.2009 | WO2009JP69422 | Priority number, date | JP20080299538 | 25.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008299538 | [2011/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010061745 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2380673 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B21D1/08, B21D3/14, B21D37/02, B21C37/30 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
B21D1/08 (EP,US);
B21C37/30 (EP,US);
B21D3/14 (EP,US);
B21D37/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/43] | B21D1/08, B21D3/14, B21D37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR KORREKTUR DER ROHRENDFORM EINES UOE-METALLROHRS | [2011/43] | English: | DEVICE FOR CORRECTING PIPE-END SHAPE OF UOE METALLIC PIPE | [2011/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR CORRIGER UNE FORME D'EXTRÉMITÉ DE TUYAU D'UN TUYAU MÉTALLIQUE UOE | [2011/43] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2011 | Translation filed | 03.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 27.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPS61165229 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [I] 1-7* abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS52109472 (SHIN MEIWA IND CO LTD); | [A]JPS5794434 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [Y]JPS6127510U (MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.); | [Y]JPH0426614U (DENGENSHA MFG. CO., LTD.) | Examination | JPS566511U | by applicant | JPH03155416 |