EP2386407 - HEAT PLATE UNIT AND DOUBLE FACER FOR FABRICATING DOUBLE-FACED CORRUGATED FIBERBOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/46] | HEAT PLATE FOR MANUFACTURING DOUBLE-SIDED CORRUGATED CARDBOARD SHEET, AND DOUBLE FACER | ||
[2016/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Printing & Packaging Machinery, Ltd. 1-1, Itosaki Minami 1-chome Mihara-shi Hiroshima 729-0393 / JP | [2016/28] |
Former [2011/46] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Printing & Packaging Machinery, Ltd. 1-1, Itosaki Minami 1 chome Mihara-shi Hiroshima 729-0393 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITOYAMA, Tadashi c/o HIROSHIMA Research & Development Center MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 6-22 Kan-on-shin-machi 4-chome Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 733-8553 / JP | 02 /
ISHIBUCHI, Hiroshi c/o HIROSHIMA Research & Development Center MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 6-22 Kan-on-shin-machi 4-chome Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 733-8553 / JP | 03 /
OKIHARA, Toshinao c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Printing & Packaging Machinery, Ltd. 1-1, Itosaki Minami 1-chome Mihara-shi Hiroshima 729-0393 / JP | 04 /
OHIRA, Kazuhito c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Printing & Packaging Machinery, Ltd. 1-1, Itosaki Minami 1-chome Mihara-shi Hiroshima 729-0393 / JP | 05 /
NITTA, Takashi c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Printing & Packaging Machinery, Ltd. 1-1, Itosaki Minami 1-chome Mihara-shi Hiroshima 729-0393 / JP | [2017/01] |
Former [2011/46] | 01 /
ITOYAMA, Tadashi c/o HIROSHIMA Research&Development Center MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 6-22 Kan-on-shin-machi 4-chome Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 733-8553 / JP | ||
02 /
ISHIBUCHI, Hiroshi c/o HIROSHIMA Research&Development Center MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 6-22 Kan-on-shin-machi 4-chome Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 733-8553 / JP | |||
03 /
OKIHARA, Toshinao c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Printing & Packaging Machinery Ltd. 1-1 Itosaki Minami 1-Chome Mihara-shi Hiroshima 729-0393 / JP | |||
04 /
OHIRA, Kazuhito c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Printing & Packaging Machinery Ltd. 1-1 Itosaki Minami 1-Chome Mihara-shi Hiroshima 729-0393 / JP | |||
05 /
NITTA, Takashi c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Printing & Packaging Machinery Ltd. 1-1 Itosaki Minami 1-Chome Mihara-shi Hiroshima 729-0393 / JP | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2017/01] |
Former [2011/46] | Bongiovanni, Simone, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 09829089.3 | 25.11.2009 | [2017/01] | WO2009JP69842 | Priority number, date | JP20080299886 | 25.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008299886 | [2011/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010061841 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2386407 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2386407 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B31F1/28 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
B31F1/285 (EP,US);
B31F1/28 (KR);
B31F1/20 (KR);
B31F1/2831 (EP,US);
B31F1/284 (EP,US);
B31F1/2881 (EP,US);
B32B37/06 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEPLATTENEINHEIT UND DOPPELKASCHIERWERK ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DOPPELSEITIGER WELLPAPPE | [2016/24] | English: | HEAT PLATE UNIT AND DOUBLE FACER FOR FABRICATING DOUBLE-FACED CORRUGATED FIBERBOARD | [2016/24] | French: | UNITE A PLAQUE CHAUFFANTE ET ONDULEUSE DOUBLE FACE POUR LA FABRICATION DE CARTON ONDULÉ DOUBLE FACE | [2016/24] |
Former [2011/46] | WÄRMEPLATTE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DOPPELSEITIGER WELLPAPPE UND DOPPELKASCHIERWERK | ||
Former [2011/46] | HEAT PLATE FOR MANUFACTURING DOUBLE-SIDED CORRUGATED CARDBOARD SHEET, AND DOUBLE FACER | ||
Former [2011/46] | PLAQUE CHAUFFANTE POUR LA FABRICATION D'UNE FEUILLE DE CARTON ONDULÉ DOUBLE FACE, ET ONDULEUSE DOUBLE FACE | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2011 | Translation filed | 22.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 19.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2009 | AT | 04.01.2017 | CY | 04.01.2017 | CZ | 04.01.2017 | DK | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | ES | 04.01.2017 | FI | 04.01.2017 | HR | 04.01.2017 | LT | 04.01.2017 | LV | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | MK | 04.01.2017 | NL | 04.01.2017 | PL | 04.01.2017 | RO | 04.01.2017 | SE | 04.01.2017 | SI | 04.01.2017 | SK | 04.01.2017 | SM | 04.01.2017 | TR | 04.01.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | NO | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | IS | 04.05.2017 | PT | 04.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 25.11.2009 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 25.11.2009 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.11.2009 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH01269526 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [X]JPH05177750 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]US6110095 (FINKE JOSEPH L [US], et al); | [Y]WO03066319 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2008102662 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH0248329 | US5183525 | US5417394 |