EP2375866 - LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samoilenko, Iurii N. Ul. Marsh. Yakubovskogo 4-114 Kiev 03192 / UA | [2011/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALUSCHAK, Valeriy S. ul. Naberezhnaya 52-1 Kamyshin Volgogradskaya obl. 403893 / RU | 02 /
SAMOILENKO, Iurii N. ul. Marsh. Yakubovskogo 4-114 Kiev 03192 / UA | [2013/52] |
Former [2013/50] | 01 /
GALUSCHAK, Valeriy S. ul. Naberezhnaya 52-1 Kamyshin Volgogradskaya obl. 403893 / RU | ||
02 /
SAMOILENKO, Iurii N. ul. Marsh. Yakubovskogo 4-114 Liev 03192 / UA | |||
Former [2011/41] | 01 /
GALUSCHAK, Valeriy S. ul. Naberezhnaya 52-1 Kamyshin Volgogradskaya obl. 403893 / RU | Representative(s) | Andrae | Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Uhlandstraße 2 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Andrae Westendorp Uhlandstrasse 2 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/41] | Andrae, Steffen, et al Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09830679.8 | 27.02.2009 | WO2009UA00010 | Priority number, date | UA20080014044 | 05.12.2008 Original published format: UA 2008014044 | [2011/41] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010065005 | Date: | 10.06.2010 | Language: | RU | [2010/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2375866 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2375866 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2375866 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 10.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/00, H05B33/08 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
H05B45/3725 (EP,US);
Y02B20/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/41] | H05B37/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAMPE MIT LEUCHTDIODE | [2011/41] | English: | LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE LAMP | [2011/41] | French: | LAMPE À DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES | [2011/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2011 | Translation filed | 04.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 13.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2009 | AT | 23.10.2013 | BE | 23.10.2013 | BG | 23.10.2013 | CY | 23.10.2013 | CZ | 23.10.2013 | DK | 23.10.2013 | EE | 23.10.2013 | ES | 23.10.2013 | FI | 23.10.2013 | HR | 23.10.2013 | IT | 23.10.2013 | LT | 23.10.2013 | LV | 23.10.2013 | MC | 23.10.2013 | MK | 23.10.2013 | MT | 23.10.2013 | PL | 23.10.2013 | RO | 23.10.2013 | SE | 23.10.2013 | SI | 23.10.2013 | SK | 23.10.2013 | TR | 23.10.2013 | NO | 23.01.2014 | GR | 24.01.2014 | IS | 23.02.2014 | PT | 24.02.2014 | GB | 27.02.2014 | IE | 27.02.2014 | LU | 27.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | FR | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 27.02.2009 | |
AT | 23.10.2013 | ||
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
GB | 27.02.2014 | ||
IE | 27.02.2014 | ||
LU | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 27.02.2009 | |
AT | 23.10.2013 | ||
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
GB | 27.02.2014 | ||
IE | 27.02.2014 | ||
LU | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
GB | 27.02.2014 | ||
IE | 27.02.2014 | ||
LU | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
GB | 27.02.2014 | ||
IE | 27.02.2014 | ||
LU | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
GB | 27.02.2014 | ||
IE | 27.02.2014 | ||
LU | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
GB | 27.02.2014 | ||
IE | 27.02.2014 | ||
LU | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
GB | 27.02.2014 | ||
IE | 27.02.2014 | ||
LU | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 27.02.2014 | ||
LU | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 27.02.2014 | ||
LU | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 27.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 23.10.2013 | |
NO | 23.01.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2005084080 (MISKIN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 4 *[A] 2,3; | [X]US2007115661 (KATO AKIRA [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US2008252229 (WU YIFENG [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5936599 (REYMOND WELLES [US]); | [A]JP2002343585 (MEIJI NAT IND); | [A]US2008157689 (KATO AKIRA [JP]); | [A]RU2329619 (DVOJCHENKO EVGENIJ VLADISLAVOV [RU], et al) | [A] - "Bolschaya sovetskaya entsiklopediya. Delitel napryazheniya. 3 izdanie", SOVETSKAYA ENTSIKLOPEDIYA, MOSCOW, (1972), vol. 8, page 60 | by applicant | RU36478U | RU2234638 | RU2285860 | RU2329619 |