EP2379870 - EXTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovative Technological Systems S.R.L. Via dell'Artigianato, 58 34070 Fogliano Redipuglia (GO) / IT | [2018/27] |
Former [2018/08] | For all designated states Innovative Technological Systems Di Fontana Claudio Via Monte Cosich 3/A 34077 Ronchi dei Legionari / IT | ||
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states Innovative Technological Systems Di Fontana Claudio Via XXV Aprile 13 34074 Monfalcone / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENTILE, Davide Strada del Friuli, 457 I-34136 Trieste / IT | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Davide Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2018/11] |
Former [2011/43] | Petraz, Davide Luigi, et al GLP Srl Piazzale Cavedalis, 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 09831293.7 | 16.12.2009 | [2018/11] | WO2009IB07787 | Priority number, date | IT2008UD00266 | 19.12.2008 Original published format: IT UD20080266 | [2011/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010070428 | Date: | 24.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2379870 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2379870 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F02G1/043, F02G1/045 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
F02G1/045 (EP,US);
F02G1/043 (EP,US);
F02G2243/30 (EP,US);
F02G2244/00 (EP,US);
F02G2270/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] | Extension states | AL | 18.07.2011 | BA | 18.07.2011 | RS | 18.07.2011 | Title | German: | MOTOR MIT ÄUSSERER VERBRENNUNG | [2011/45] | English: | EXTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2011/43] | French: | MOTEUR À COMBUSTION EXTERNE | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/43] | MOTOR MIT ?USSERER VERBRENNUNG | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2009 | Translation filed | 18.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 03.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2009 | AT | 14.03.2018 | CY | 14.03.2018 | CZ | 14.03.2018 | DK | 14.03.2018 | EE | 14.03.2018 | ES | 14.03.2018 | FI | 14.03.2018 | HR | 14.03.2018 | LT | 14.03.2018 | LV | 14.03.2018 | MC | 14.03.2018 | MK | 14.03.2018 | NL | 14.03.2018 | PL | 14.03.2018 | RO | 14.03.2018 | SI | 14.03.2018 | SK | 14.03.2018 | SM | 14.03.2018 | TR | 14.03.2018 | BG | 14.06.2018 | NO | 14.06.2018 | GR | 15.06.2018 | IS | 14.07.2018 | PT | 16.07.2018 | GB | 16.12.2018 | LU | 16.12.2018 | MT | 16.12.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 16.12.2009 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
GB | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
MT | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 16.12.2009 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
GB | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
MT | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
GB | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
MT | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
GB | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
MT | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
GB | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4228656 (FROSCH ROBERT A ADMINISTRATOR, et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US4240256 (FROSCH ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2005054640 (SAKUSHIYON GAS KIKAN SEISAKUSH) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO2007114087 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1; | EP2006524 [ ] (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0025] * |