EP2464564 - A CONTROLLABLE BUOYANCY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lyons, Tim 32 Grove Street Shoalwater, Western Australia 6010 / AU | [2012/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Green, Mark Charles Murgitroyd & Company London Euston House 24 Eversholt Street London NW1 1AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Green, Mark Charles Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 3rd Floor 33 Glasshouse Street London W1B 5DG / GB | Application number, filing date | 09831313.3 | 09.12.2009 | WO2009AU01599 | Priority number, date | AU20090903837 | 14.08.2009 Original published format: AU 2009903837 | [2012/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010065999 | Date: | 17.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2464564 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 17.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B63C7/10, B63G8/40, E02B17/02, B64D25/00, B63B38/00, B64C1/34, E02D29/09, B63C9/28, B64D47/00, B63B35/00 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
B63C7/10 (EP,US);
B64D25/18 (EP,US);
E21B19/002 (EP,US);
B63G8/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Title | German: | REGELBARES AUFTRIEBSSYSTEM | [2012/25] | English: | A CONTROLLABLE BUOYANCY SYSTEM | [2012/25] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FLOTTABILITÉ CONTRÔLABLE | [2012/25] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 17.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/17] | 18.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 17.01.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 17.01.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.02.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 17.01.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 17.01.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.02.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.2013 | 31.12.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2435856 (PRITCHARD PHILIP ANTHONY [GB]) [X] 1-4,10,23,25,26 * abstract * * page 17, line 16 - page 19, line 28 * * figures 10-13 * [Y] 24; | [X]GB1208162 (ROCKET RESEARCH CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,25,26 * the whole document *; | [X]US6347970 (WEINEL JOHN THOMAS [US]) [X] 1-3,23,25 * abstract * * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 64 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9210618 (MAHLKOW GERHARD [DE]) [Y] 24 * abstract * * figure 1 * | International search | [X]NL1024588C (ANTONIUS JOHANNES JOSEPHUS COLEN TE KRIMIPEN A.D. IJSSEL); | [X]US4945851 (BUCKLE); | [X]US3146750 (EBBETS ET AL); | [X]WO9701480 (CONTROLLED LIFTING INTERNATIONAL LTD); | [X]WO0029285 (CONTROLLED VARIABLE BUOYANCY SYSTEMS LIMITED); | [Y]US3613616 (BASSET) |