EP2367225 - ALKALINE DRY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Fumio c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61 Shirmoi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NUNOME, Jun c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61 Shirmoi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
SHIMAMURA, Harunari c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61 Shirmoi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2011/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09831602.9 | 02.10.2009 | WO2009JP05119 | Priority number, date | JP20080317587 | 12.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008317587 | [2011/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010067493 | Date: | 17.06.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2367225 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01M6/08, H01M2/26, H01M4/06, H01M2/02, H01M4/12, H01M6/04 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
H01M6/08 (EP,US);
H01M4/12 (EP,US);
H01M50/182 (EP,US);
H01M6/045 (EP,US);
H01M10/4235 (EP,US);
H01M2004/021 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0014 (EP,US);
H01M4/42 (EP,US);
H01M4/50 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/38] | H01M6/08, H01M2/26, H01M4/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ALKALINE-TROCKENBATTERIE | [2011/38] | English: | ALKALINE DRY BATTERY | [2011/38] | French: | PILE SÈCHE ALCALINE | [2011/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2011 | Translation filed | 13.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/38] | 22.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/29] | 26.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008142818 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | EP2166605 [ ] (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [ ] * the whole document * * see [0011] - [0016]; Tables 1 - 4; claims *; | [I]EP1729362 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-10 * the whole document * * see [0010] - [0014]; claims *; | [I]JP2000173602 (TOSHIBA BATTERY) [I] 1-10 * abstract *; | [I]JP2004063357 (HITACHI MAXELL) [I] 1-10 * abstract *; | [Y]WO0033405 (EVEREADY BATTERY INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * * see p.8, l.5 - p.9, l.19; claims *; | [Y]WO2006047852 (TECK COMINCO METALS LTD [CA], et al) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * * seep.7, l.23- p.8, l.21; claims *; | [Y]JPS5111769B (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2008034375 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1739773 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * * see [0019] - [0021]; claims *; | [Y]WO02075825 (PHILLIPS JEFFREY [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * * see [0022] - [0031]; claims *; | [X]US6586139 (WATANABE SHUNJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * * see col.10, l.22 - 65; claims * | International search | [Y]JP2008518408 (TECK COMINCO METALS LTD.); | [Y]JP2002531923 (EVEREADY BATTERY CO., INC.); | [Y]JPS5111769B (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.); | [Y]JP2008034375 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005276698 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0426065 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPS4516654B (IESUPI INKOPORETEDDO); | [Y]WO2005104277 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH06196155 (FUJI ELECTROCHEMICAL CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2008518408 | JP2005294225 |