EP2376892 - COMPONENTS SUITABLE FOR USE IN DEVICES SUCH AS AN EVAPORATIVE LIGHT SCATTERING DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Büchi Labortechnik AG Meierseggstrasse 40 9230 Flawil / CH | [2016/34] |
Former [2011/42] | For all designated states Alltech Associates Inc. 7500 Grace Drive Columbia, Maryland 21044 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARRI-NORDHAUS, Raaidah 709 Birch Hollow Drive Antioch IL 60002 / US | 02 /
ANDERSON, James, M., Jr. 2526 East Hunter Arlington Heights IL 60004 / US | 03 /
MENDOZA, Washington, J. 3 Sonoma Court Lakes in the Hills IL 60156 / US | 04 /
BYSTRON, Josef, P. 5809 N. Kenton Chicago IL 60646 / US | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | Müller, Christoph Emanuel Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09832237.3 | 10.12.2009 | WO2009US06492 | Priority number, date | US20080201348P | 10.12.2008 Original published format: US 201348 P | [2011/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010068272 | Date: | 17.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2376892 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/00, G01N30/74, G01N30/88 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
G01N30/74 (EP,US);
G01N30/00 (KR);
G01N21/00 (KR);
G01N30/88 (EP,US);
G01N2030/847 (EP,US);
G01N2030/8881 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
G01N30/74, G01N21/47 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/42] | G01N21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOMPONENTEN FÜR GERÄTE WIE ETWA EINEN VERDUNSTUNGSLICHTSTREUUNGSDETEKTOR | [2011/42] | English: | COMPONENTS SUITABLE FOR USE IN DEVICES SUCH AS AN EVAPORATIVE LIGHT SCATTERING DETECTOR | [2011/42] | French: | COMPOSANTS ADAPTÉS À UNE UTILISATION DANS DES DISPOSITIFS TELS QU UN DÉTECTEUR ÉVAPORATIF DE DIFFUSION DE LUMIÈRE | [2011/42] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 04.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5887446 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1,2,13 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2001239181 (NATL INST OF IND HEALTH MINIST) [Y] 1,2,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0052] - [0056] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2007242275 (SPARTZ MARTIN L [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0 38] * * figure 8 *; | [Y]WO2007103044 (ALLTECH ASSOCIATES INC [US], et al) [Y] 3-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0046] * * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US6122055 (O'DONOHUE STEPHEN J [GB], et al) [Y] 7 * abstract * * column 4, lines 8-23 * * column 3, lines 48-50 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1275961 (SEDERE S A [FR], et al) [Y] 8-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US2006027490 (DEMARCO NICHOLAS [US]) [Y] 12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0041] * * figure 1 * | [Y] - QING-YAN LI ET AL, "Cucurbitane triterpenoids fromMomordica charantia", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN CHEMISTRY, (20070601), vol. 45, no. 6, doi:10.1002/mrc.1989, ISSN 0749-1581, pages 451 - 456, XP055025299 [Y] 1-13 * page 454, column 2, lines 10-25 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrc.1989 | International search | [X]US6568245 (KAUFMAN STANLEY L [US]); | [X]US7129479 (CARROLL JOHN J [US], et al); | [Y]US4748377 (KING ROBIN C M [GB]) |