EP2368303 - ISLANDING DETECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMA ALGEBRAICA S.L. Avda. de Alava 3 20550 Aretxabaleta / ES | [2016/22] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states SUMA ALGEBRAICA S.L. Avda. de Alava 3 20550 Aretxabaleta / ES | ||
Former [2011/39] | For all designated states Whisper Tech Limited 224 Armagh street Christchurch 8011 / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Vinod 1/291 Barbadoes Street Christchurch 8011 / NZ | 02 /
BAKER, Joshua 2 Springbank Street Burnside Christchurch 8053 / NZ | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | Igartua, Ismael, et al Galbaian S.Coop. Polo de Innovación Garaia Goiru Kalea 1A, 4° 20500 Arrasate-Mondragón / ES | [2013/16] |
Former [2012/49] | Stanners, David Ralph, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 3rd Floor 33 Glasshouse Street London W1B 5DG / GB | ||
Former [2011/39] | Higgs, Jonathan Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 3rd Floor 33 Glasshouse Street London W1B 5DG / GB | Application number, filing date | 09833689.4 | 17.12.2009 | [2016/22] | WO2009NZ00294 | Priority number, date | NZ20080573748 | 17.12.2008 Original published format: NZ 57374808 | [2011/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010071457 | Date: | 24.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2368303 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2368303 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02H3/00, H02J3/38, H02J11/00 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
H02J3/38 (EP);
H02J3/388 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ERKENNUNG VON INSELBILDUNG | [2011/39] | English: | ISLANDING DETECTION SYSTEM | [2011/39] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION D'ÎLOTAGE | [2011/39] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/39] | 11.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.01.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2009 | AT | 01.06.2016 | BE | 01.06.2016 | BG | 01.06.2016 | CY | 01.06.2016 | CZ | 01.06.2016 | DK | 01.06.2016 | EE | 01.06.2016 | FI | 01.06.2016 | HR | 01.06.2016 | IT | 01.06.2016 | LT | 01.06.2016 | LV | 01.06.2016 | MC | 01.06.2016 | MK | 01.06.2016 | NL | 01.06.2016 | PL | 01.06.2016 | RO | 01.06.2016 | SE | 01.06.2016 | SI | 01.06.2016 | SK | 01.06.2016 | SM | 01.06.2016 | TR | 01.06.2016 | NO | 01.09.2016 | GR | 02.09.2016 | IS | 01.10.2016 | PT | 03.10.2016 | IE | 17.12.2016 | LU | 17.12.2016 | MT | 17.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 17.12.2009 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
TR | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
IE | 17.12.2016 | ||
LU | 17.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 17.12.2009 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
TR | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
IE | 17.12.2016 | ||
LU | 17.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 17.12.2009 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
IE | 17.12.2016 | ||
LU | 17.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
IE | 17.12.2016 | ||
LU | 17.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 01.06.2016 | |
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 01.06.2016 | |
NO | 01.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ROHIT S KUNTE ET AL, "Comparison and review of islanding detection techniques for distributed energy resources", POWER SYMPOSIUM, 2008. NAPS '08. 40TH NORTH AMERICAN, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080928), ISBN 978-1-4244-4283-6, pages 1 - 8, XP031558601 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - KLIBER J ET AL, "Local anti-islanding protection for distributed generators based on impedance measurements", ELECTRIC POWER CONFERENCE, 2008. EPEC 2008. IEEE CANADA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081006), ISBN 978-1-4244-2894-6, pages 1 - 5, XP031413755 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]EP1278282 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]); | [A]US2003098671 (HOCHGRAF CLARK GLENN [US]); | [A]US2003147191 (DENG DUO [US], et al); | [A]US2005254191 (BASHAW TRAVIS B [US], et al); | [A]US2007093978 (WALLING REIGH A [US], et al); | [A]US2008122293 (OHM DAL Y [US]) |