EP2370615 - ELECTROPLATING METHOD AND ELECTROPLATED PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Byd Company Limited No. 3001, Hengping Road Pingshan Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2011/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Jipeng No.3001 Hengping Road Pingshan Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 02 /
LI, Aihua No.3001 Hengping Road Pingshan Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 03 /
LI, Zaichun No.3001 Hengping Road Pingshan Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 04 /
PENG, Bo No.3001 Hengping Road Pingshan Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 09834074.8 | 14.12.2009 | WO2009CN75555 | Priority number, date | CN20081241685 | 26.12.2008 Original published format: CN200810241685 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010072121 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2370615 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/10, C25D5/44, C25D5/30, C23C28/02, C25D3/06, C25D3/38, C25D3/58, C25D5/12 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
C23C28/023 (EP,US);
C23C28/021 (EP,US);
C23C28/025 (EP,US);
C25D3/06 (EP,US);
C25D3/38 (EP,US);
C25D3/58 (EP,US);
C25D5/12 (EP,US);
C25D5/611 (EP,US);
C25D5/627 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12736 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/40] | C25D5/10, C25D5/44, C25D5/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTROPLATTIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND ELEKTROPLATTIERTES PRODUKT | [2011/40] | English: | ELECTROPLATING METHOD AND ELECTROPLATED PRODUCT | [2011/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GALVANOPLASTIE, ET PRODUIT TRAITÉ PAR GALVANOPLASTIE | [2011/40] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 09.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/22] | 18.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US6692630 (MORIN LOUIS CHARLES [CA], et al) [I] 15 * claims 1,5,6,12,15,16,22-24,27,28,32,33,35-37,45,46 * * figure 1 * * examples 2,4,11 * * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 42 * * column 5, lines 24-31 * * column 6, lines 4-6 * [Y] 1-14; | [Y]US5246565 (NIGNARDOT HENRY [US]) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1,3 * * column 2, lines 27-47 * * column 3, lines 26-30 *; | [Y]US6416571 (KANEKO MITSURU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claim 1 * * examples 1-5 * * tables 2-6 *; | [Y]US7052592 (EDIGARYAN ARAMAYIS [US]) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1,6 * | International search | [A]JPS5950194 (TOKYO METSUKI KK); | [A]CN1936093 (KAISHENG LAMP HOLDER IND CO LT [CN]); | [X]CN101063217 (GUANGZHOU SANFU CHEMICAL INDUS [CN]); | [XP]CN101580952 (GUANGZHOU CITY SANFU CHEMICAL [CN]); | [A] - ZHANG YUNCHENG ET AL., ELECTROPLATING HANDBOOK, BEIJING, (2002), vol. 1 | [A] - LIU JIANPING, "Cyanide-free electroplating process of copper-tin alloy with high tin content", LECTROPLATING & FINISHING, (200803), vol. 27, no. 3, XP008163011 |