EP2369267 - SOLAR TRACKING DEVICE FOR PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Global Solar Fund Partners SARL Carre Bonn 20 Rue de la Poste L2346 Luxemburgo / LU | [2011/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOMINGO CABO, Alberto Carre Bonn 20 Rue de la Poste 2346 Luxembourg / LU | 02 /
LÁZARO FERNÁNDEZ, Carlos Carre Bonn 20 Rue de la Poste 2346 Luxembourg / LU | 03 /
PALACIOS CLIMENT, Francisco José Carre Bonn 20 Rue de la Poste 2346 Luxembourg / LU | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Ungria Lopez, Javier Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 09834158.9 | 03.12.2009 | WO2009ES70556 | Priority number, date | ES20080003694 | 24.12.2008 Original published format: ES 200803694 | [2011/39] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010072871 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | ES | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2369267 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 01.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/54, H01L31/042 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
H02S20/10 (EP,US);
H02S20/00 (ES);
F24S30/455 (EP,ES,US);
H02S20/32 (EP,US);
F24S2030/136 (EP,US);
Y02E10/47 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SONNENNACHFÜHRVORRICHTUNG FÜR SOLARPANEELE | [2011/39] | English: | SOLAR TRACKING DEVICE FOR PANELS | [2011/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POURSUITE SOLAIRE POUR DES PANNEAUX | [2011/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2011 | Translation filed | 14.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/39] | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/52] | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008090241 (EN ERCAM S A [ES], et al) [A] 1-5 * pages 8-12; figures 1-2,5-10 *; | [A]ES1067736U (FERRERIA R M SANTASUSANA S L [ES]) [A] 1-5 * page 4; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102004018151 (NEFF SIEGFRIED [DE]) [A] 1-5 * pages 3-4; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE102006010162 (CONERGY AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * columns 4-5; figures 1-2 *; | [A]EP2000750 (DEGIOVANNI EZIO [IT]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0017] - [0030]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO0155651 (HABER MICHAEL B [AU]) [A] 1-5 * pages 8-18; figures 1-2 * | International search | [A]ES1067736U (FERRERIA R M SANTASUSANA S L [ES]); | [A]US4187123 (DIGGS RICHARD E [US]); | [A]WO2006020597 (SHELL SOLAR IND INTERNATIONAL [US], et al); | [A]US2007012312 (HAYDEN HERBERT T [US]) |