EP2384000 - IMAGE ENCODING DEVICE, IMAGE ENCODING METHOD, PROGRAM THEREOF, IMAGE DECODING DEVICE, IMAGE DECODING METHOD, AND PROGRAM THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JVC KENWOOD Corporation 12, Moriya-cho 3-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | [2012/16] |
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states Victor Company Of Japan, Limited 12 Moriya-cho 3-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-8528 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Hiroya c/o Victor Company of Japan Limited 12 Moriya-cho 3-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-8528 / JP | 02 /
UEDA, Motoharu c/o Victor Company of Japan Limited 12 Moriya-cho 3-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-8528 / JP | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09834328.8 | 09.12.2009 | WO2009JP06715 | Priority number, date | JP20080333854 | 26.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008333854 | JP20080333855 | 26.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008333855 | JP20080333856 | 26.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008333856 | JP20080333857 | 26.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008333857 | JP20080333858 | 26.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008333858 | JP20080333859 | 26.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008333859 | [2011/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010073513 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2384000 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2384000 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
H04N19/597 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDKODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDKODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, PROGRAMM DAFÜR, BILDDEKODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDDEKODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM DAFÜR | [2011/44] | English: | IMAGE ENCODING DEVICE, IMAGE ENCODING METHOD, PROGRAM THEREOF, IMAGE DECODING DEVICE, IMAGE DECODING METHOD, AND PROGRAM THEREOF | [2011/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE D'IMAGE ET PROGRAMME ASSOCIÉ, DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE ET PROGRAMME ASSOCIÉ | [2011/44] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2011 | Translation filed | 26.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 15.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.12.2009 | AT | 16.10.2013 | BE | 16.10.2013 | BG | 16.10.2013 | CY | 16.10.2013 | CZ | 16.10.2013 | DK | 16.10.2013 | EE | 16.10.2013 | ES | 16.10.2013 | FI | 16.10.2013 | HR | 16.10.2013 | IT | 16.10.2013 | LT | 16.10.2013 | LV | 16.10.2013 | MC | 16.10.2013 | MK | 16.10.2013 | MT | 16.10.2013 | NL | 16.10.2013 | PL | 16.10.2013 | RO | 16.10.2013 | SE | 16.10.2013 | SI | 16.10.2013 | SK | 16.10.2013 | SM | 16.10.2013 | TR | 16.10.2013 | IE | 09.12.2013 | LU | 09.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | FR | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | NO | 16.01.2014 | GR | 17.01.2014 | IS | 16.02.2014 | PT | 17.02.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 09.12.2009 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
GR | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MK | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
SM | 16.10.2013 | ||
TR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | HU | 09.12.2009 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
GR | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
SM | 16.10.2013 | ||
TR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 09.12.2009 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
SM | 16.10.2013 | ||
TR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
SM | 16.10.2013 | ||
TR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
SM | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
LU | 09.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
LU | 09.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
LU | 09.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
LU | 09.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 16.10.2013 | |
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 16.10.2013 | |
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 16.10.2013 | |
NO | 16.01.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008153294 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-6 * figures 6b, 8a ** paragraphs [0013] , [0 16] , [0 17] * | International search | [A]JP2001061164 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [X]JP2008263528 (UNIV NAGOYA) | by applicant | JPS61144191 | JPH0698312 | JPH0981746 |