EP2371775 - GLASS SUBSTRATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited Shin-Marunouchi Building 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAI, Kensuke c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 02 /
KUROKI, Yuichi c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 03 /
MAEDA, Kei c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09834605.9 | 14.10.2009 | WO2009JP67799 | Priority number, date | JP20080330200 | 25.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008330200 | [2011/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010073799 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2371775 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/087, C03B18/18, C03B18/20, H01J29/86 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
C03B18/18 (EP,KR,US);
C03C3/087 (EP,KR,US);
C03B18/20 (EP,KR,US);
H01J11/34 (EP,US);
H01J29/86 (KR);
H01J9/241 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GLASSUBSTRAT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/40] | English: | GLASS SUBSTRATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2011/40] | French: | SUBSTRAT EN VERRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2011/40] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2011 | Translation filed | 21.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 20.02.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH09301733 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]JPH1143347 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000351649 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001058843 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]WO2008056527 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH10152338 | JPH10255669 | JPH10334813 | JP2004189591 |