EP2385115 - EXPRESSION VECTOR FOR PRODUCING PROTEIN DERIVED FROM FOREIGN GENE IN LARGE QUANTITY USING ANIMAL CELLS, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Hokkaido University 8, Kita 8-jyo Nishi 5-chome Kita-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0808 / JP | For all designated states Fuso Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. 7-10 Dosho-machi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states National University Corporation Hokkaido University 8, Kita 8-jyo Nishi 5-chome Kita-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0808 / JP | ||
For all designated states Fuso Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. 7-10 Dosho-machi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | |||
Former [2011/45] | For all designated states National University Corporation Hokkaido University 8, Kita 8-jyo Nishi 5-chome Kita-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0808 / JP | ||
For all designated states Fuso Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. 7-10, Dosho-Machi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAHARA, Hiroshi c/o WORLD INTEC CO. LTD. 5F Nakatsu Bldg. 1-17-26 Nakatsu Kita-ku Osaka / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Yusuke c/o WORLD INTEC CO. LTD. 5F Nakatsu Bldg. 1-17-26 Nakatsu Kita-ku Osaka / JP | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Keiichi c/o FUSO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. Research and Development Center 2-3-30 Morinomiya Joto-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 536-0025 / JP | 04 /
KITAHARA, Yuzuru c/o FUSO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. Research and Development Center 2-3-30 Morinomiya Joto-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 536-0025 / JP | 05 /
SUZUKI, Yasuhiko c/o National University Corporation, Hokkaido University, Kita 8-jyo Nishi 5-chome Kita-ku, Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 0600808 / JP | [2012/16] |
Former [2012/09] | 01 /
TAHARA, Hiroshi c/o WORLD INTEC CO. LTD. 5F Nakatsu Bldg. 1-17-26 Nakatsu Kita-ku Osaka / JP | ||
02 /
SUZUKI, Yusuke c/o WORLD INTEC CO. LTD. 5F Nakatsu Bldg. 1-17-26 Nakatsu Kita-ku Osaka / JP | |||
03 /
YAMAMOTO, Keiichi c/o FUSO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. Research and Development Center 2-3-30 Morinomiya Joto-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 536-0025 / JP | |||
04 /
KITAHARA, Yuzuru c/o FUSO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. Research and Development Center 2-3-30 Morinomiya Joto-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 536-0025 / JP | |||
Former [2011/45] | 01 /
TAHARA, Hiroshi c/o WORLD INTEC CO. LTD. 13th Floor PIAS TOWER 3-19-3 Toyosaki, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 531-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
SUZUKI, Yusuke c/o WORLD INTEC CO. LTD. 13th Floor PIAS TOWER 3-19-3 Toyosaki, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 531-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMAMOTO, Keiichi c/o FUSO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. Research and Development Center 2-3-30 Morinomiya Joto-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 536-0025 / JP | |||
04 /
KITAHARA, Yuzuru c/o FUSO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. Research and Development Center 2-3-30 Morinomiya Joto-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 536-0025 / JP | Representative(s) | Bösl, Raphael Konrad Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/37] | Bösl, Raphael Konrad Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/45] | Bösl, Raphael Konrad Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09834881.6 | 22.12.2009 | [2015/37] | WO2009JP71326 | Priority number, date | JP20080325690 | 22.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008325690 | [2011/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010074080 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2385115 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2385115 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12P21/02, C12Q1/02 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
C12P21/02 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/85 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/00 (KR);
C12N2830/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/37] | Extension states | AL | 07.07.2011 | BA | 07.07.2011 | RS | 07.07.2011 | Title | German: | EXPRESSIONSVEKTOR ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VON EINEM FREMDGEN ABGELEITETEM PROTEIN IN GROSSER MENGE UNTER VERWENDUNG VON TIERZELLEN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2011/45] | English: | EXPRESSION VECTOR FOR PRODUCING PROTEIN DERIVED FROM FOREIGN GENE IN LARGE QUANTITY USING ANIMAL CELLS, AND USE THEREOF | [2011/45] | French: | VECTEUR D'EXPRESSION POUR PRODUIRE UNE PROTÉINE ISSUE D'UN GÈNE ÉTRANGER EN GRANDE QUANTITÉ À L'AIDE DE CELLULES ANIMALES, ET SON UTILISATION | [2011/45] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2011 | Translation filed | 07.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/45] | 30.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2009 | BG | 09.09.2015 | CY | 09.09.2015 | CZ | 09.09.2015 | EE | 09.09.2015 | HR | 09.09.2015 | LT | 09.09.2015 | LV | 09.09.2015 | MC | 09.09.2015 | MK | 09.09.2015 | MT | 09.09.2015 | PL | 09.09.2015 | RO | 09.09.2015 | SI | 09.09.2015 | SK | 09.09.2015 | SM | 09.09.2015 | TR | 09.09.2015 | NO | 09.12.2015 | GR | 10.12.2015 | IE | 22.12.2015 | LU | 22.12.2015 | IS | 09.01.2016 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 22.12.2009 | |
BG | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/11] | HR | 09.09.2015 | |
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | LT | 09.09.2015 | |
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 09.09.2015 | |
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 09.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006048459 (CHROMAGENICS BV [NL]; OTTE ARIE PIETER [NL]; VAN BLOKLAND HENRICUS JOH) [A] 1-10; | [A]WO0132901 (CHIRON CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004024915 (UNIV QUEENSLAND [AU]; FRAZER IAN HECTOR [AU]) [A] 1-10 | International search | [Y]JP2008518613 (CHROMAGENICS B.V.); | [Y]US5627033 (RESEARCH & DIAGNOSTICS SYSTEMS, INC.); | [A]JP2006507842 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG.); | [A]JP2003513635 (KAIRON CORP.); | [A]JPH08503138 (IDEC PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.); | [A]JPH06506356 (GENENTECH, INC.); | [A]WO2006106970 (FUSO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.); | [A]JPH06165672 (GENENTECH, INC.); | [A]JP2006500927 (THE UNIVERSITY OF QUEENSLAND) | [A] - VAN BLOCKLAND H.J. ET AL, "A novel, high stringency selection system allows screening of few clones for high protein expression", J. BIOTECHNOL., (20070201), vol. 128, no. 2, pages 237 - 245, XP005829332 | [A] - ASSELBERGS F.A. ET AL, "Use of the Escherichia coli chromosomal DHFR gene as selection marker in mammalian cells", J. BIOTECHNOL., (19951201), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 133 - 138, XP004036893 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1656(95)00131-3 | [A] - GRILLARI J. ET AL, "Analysis of alterations in gene expression after amplification of recombinant genes in CHO cells", J. BIOTECHNOL., (20010427), vol. 87, no. 1, pages 59 - 65, XP004231296 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-1656(00)00431-4 | [A] - GANDOR C. ET AL, "Amplification and expression of recombinant genes in serum-independent Chinese hamster ovary cells", FEBS LETT., (19951227), vol. 377, no. 3, pages 290 - 294, XP026563654 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(95)01328-8 | Examination | - ASSELBERGS F A M ET AL, "Use of the Escherichia coli chromosomal DHFR gene as selection marker in mammalian cells", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19951201), vol. 43, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0168-1656(95)00131-3, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 133 - 138, XP004036893 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1656(95)00131-3 |