EP2377661 - METHOD OF CUTTING A STONE USING A RECIPROCATING FRAME GANG SAW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/42] | WORKPIECE FOR FRAME GANG SAW, METHOD FOR CUTTING THE WORKPIECE, AND PRODUCT CUT BY THE METHOD | ||
[2018/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EHWA Diamond Industrial Co., Ltd. 520-2 Won-dong Osan, Gyunggi-do 447-060 / KR | [2011/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Hee-Dong 603-1002 GangnamMaeul Sumitvill Apt. Gugal-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 446-779 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Nam-Kwang 206-404 Hyundai 2 cha Apt. Bokdae-dong Heungdeok-gu Cheongju Chungcheongbuk-do 361-270 / KR | [2018/41] |
Former [2012/02] | 01 /
PARK, Hee-Dong 603-1002 GangnamMaeui Sumitvill Apt. Gugai-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 446-779 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Nam-Kwang 206-404 Hyundai 2 cha Apt. Bokdae-dong Heungdeok-gu Cheongju Chungcheongbuk-do 361-270 / KR | |||
Former [2011/42] | 01 /
PARK, Hee-Dong 313-1802 Cheongmyeong Maeul Dongsin Apt. Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon Gyunggi-do 443-470 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Nam-Kwang 206-404 Hyundai 2 cha Apt. Bokdae-dong Heungdeok-gu Cheongju Chungcheongbuk-do 361-270 / KR | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2018/41] |
Former [2011/42] | Bongiovanni, Simone, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 09835279.2 | 23.12.2009 | [2018/41] | WO2009KR07734 | Priority number, date | KR20080132553 | 23.12.2008 Original published format: KR 20080132553 | [2011/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010074513 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2377661 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2377661 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B28D1/06 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
B28D1/06 (EP,KR,US);
B23D61/12 (KR);
B27B3/10 (KR);
B28D1/12 (KR);
Y10T428/2457 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/42] | B28D1/06, B28D1/12, B27B3/10, B23D61/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHNEIDEN EINES STEINS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER GATTERSÄGE | [2018/11] | English: | METHOD OF CUTTING A STONE USING A RECIPROCATING FRAME GANG SAW | [2018/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TAILLE D'UNE PIERRE EN UTILISANT UNE SCIE ALTERNATIVE À CHASSIS ET À LAMES MULTIPLES | [2018/11] |
Former [2011/42] | WERKSTÜCK FÜR EINE GATTERSÄGE, VERFAHREN ZUM SCHNEIDEN DES WERKSTÜCKS UND ANHAND DES VERFAHRENS GESCHNITTENES PRODUKT | ||
Former [2011/42] | WORKPIECE FOR FRAME GANG SAW, METHOD FOR CUTTING THE WORKPIECE, AND PRODUCT CUT BY THE METHOD | ||
Former [2011/42] | PIÈCE À TRAVAILLER POUR SCIE ALTERNATIVE À LAMES MULTIPLES, PROCÉDÉ DE TAILLE DE LA PIÈCE À TRAVAILLER, ET PRODUIT TAILLÉ SELON CE PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2011 | Translation filed | 13.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 18.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 29.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2009 | AT | 10.10.2018 | CY | 10.10.2018 | CZ | 10.10.2018 | DK | 10.10.2018 | EE | 10.10.2018 | FI | 10.10.2018 | HR | 10.10.2018 | LT | 10.10.2018 | LV | 10.10.2018 | MC | 10.10.2018 | MK | 10.10.2018 | NL | 10.10.2018 | RO | 10.10.2018 | SE | 10.10.2018 | SI | 10.10.2018 | SK | 10.10.2018 | SM | 10.10.2018 | TR | 10.10.2018 | IE | 23.12.2018 | LU | 23.12.2018 | MT | 23.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | FR | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | BG | 10.01.2019 | GB | 10.01.2019 | NO | 10.01.2019 | GR | 11.01.2019 | IS | 10.02.2019 | DE | 02.07.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
MT | 23.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GB | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
DE | 02.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
MT | 23.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GB | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
DE | 02.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
MT | 23.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GB | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
DE | 02.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GB | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
DE | 02.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GB | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
DE | 02.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
DE | 02.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
DE | 02.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 10.10.2018 | |
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 10.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US1160452 (SARGENT ALLSTON [US]) [X] 1-6,8-14,16 * page 2, column l, line 4 - line 25 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 7,15; | [XI]US1349955 (JOHN HARWOOD) [X] 1-6,8-16 * the whole document * * in particular: * * claim 1 * [I] 7; | [XI]JPH05337932 (OISHI ENG YUGEN) [X] 1-6,8-14,16 * the whole document * [I] 7,15; | [XI]JPH07232319 (SETETSUKU KK M) [X] 1-6,8-14,16 * the whole document * [I] 7,15; | [XI]JPH1110632 (SUNCALL CORP, et al) [X] 1-6,8-14,16 * the whole document * * in particular: * * figures 2,3 * [I] 7,15; | [XAI]US2003127086 (BRAUNINGER GOETZ H [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,8-14,16 * the whole document * [A] 15[I] 7; | [XA]CN2875759Y (DONG YANPING [CN]) [X] 1-6,8-14,16 * the whole document * [A] 7,15 | International search | [Y]KR100466510B (SHINHAN DIAMOND IND CO LTD); | [Y]KR100564271B (SHINHANDIAMONDINDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.); | [Y]KR100680851B (EHWA DIAMOND IND CO LTD [KR], et al) |