EP2359173 - WAFER LEVEL OPTOELECTRONIC PACKAGE WITH FIBER SIDE INSERTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Semiconductor Corporation 2900 Semiconductor Drive Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | [2011/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARBINYAN, Artur 3604 Flora Vista Avenue 317 Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | 02 /
NGUYEN, Luu 3425 Pin Oak Court San Jose, CA 95148 / US | 03 /
PODDAR, Anindya 1011 Havre Court Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09836560.4 | 11.09.2009 | [2011/34] | WO2009US56693 | Priority number, date | US20080337533 | 17.12.2008 Original published format: US 337533 | [2011/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010077394 | Date: | 08.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2359173 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/12, G02B6/42 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
G02B6/4214 (EP,US);
G02B6/4232 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Title | German: | OPTOELEKTRONISCHES WAFER-PAKET MIT FASERSEITENEINSATZ | [2011/34] | English: | WAFER LEVEL OPTOELECTRONIC PACKAGE WITH FIBER SIDE INSERTION | [2011/34] | French: | BOÎTIER OPTOÉLECTRONIQUE NIVEAU TRANCHE À INSERTION LATÉRALE DE FIBRES | [2011/34] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 05.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/41] | 22.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.11.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2004037703 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRON) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0009]; figure - *; | [Y]US2006104576 (NAGASAKA KIMIO [JP]) [Y] 1-19 * paragraphs [0007] - [0059]; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2004251524 (SNYDER TANYA JEGERIS [US], et al) [A] 11,17,18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0017] , [0019] * | International search | [X]US4945400 (BLONDER GREG E [US], et al); | [X]US7306378 (ALDUINO ANDREW C [US], et al); | [A]US5369529 (KUO SHUN-MEEN [US], et al) |