EP2370926 - EXTENSIBLE ACTIVATION EXPLOIT SCANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Microsoft Corp. One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUREVICH, Peter, Alexi Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2017/39] |
Former [2011/40] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09836607.3 | 19.11.2009 | [2017/39] | WO2009US65098 | Priority number, date | US20080346391 | 30.12.2008 Original published format: US 346391 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010077469 | Date: | 08.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2370926 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2370926 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/10, G06F21/12, G06F21/56 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
G06F21/105 (EP,US);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F21/121 (EP,US);
G06F21/16 (EP,US);
G06F21/56 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2137 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/40] | G06F21/00, G06F21/22, G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXPLOIT-SCANNER MIT VERLÄNGERBARER AKTIVIERUNG | [2011/40] | English: | EXTENSIBLE ACTIVATION EXPLOIT SCANNER | [2011/40] | French: | ANALYSEUR D'EXPLOIT À ACTIVATION EXTENSIBLE | [2011/40] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 24.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.11.2009 | AT | 27.09.2017 | CY | 27.09.2017 | CZ | 27.09.2017 | DK | 27.09.2017 | EE | 27.09.2017 | ES | 27.09.2017 | FI | 27.09.2017 | HR | 27.09.2017 | IT | 27.09.2017 | LT | 27.09.2017 | LV | 27.09.2017 | MC | 27.09.2017 | MK | 27.09.2017 | PL | 27.09.2017 | PT | 27.09.2017 | RO | 27.09.2017 | SE | 27.09.2017 | SI | 27.09.2017 | SK | 27.09.2017 | SM | 27.09.2017 | TR | 27.09.2017 | IE | 19.11.2017 | LU | 19.11.2017 | MT | 19.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | BG | 27.12.2017 | NO | 27.12.2017 | GR | 28.12.2017 | IS | 27.01.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 19.11.2009 | |
AT | 27.09.2017 | ||
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
MT | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.11.2009 | |
AT | 27.09.2017 | ||
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
MT | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.11.2009 | |
AT | 27.09.2017 | ||
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
MT | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.11.2009 | |
AT | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
MT | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
MT | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
MT | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
MT | 19.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
MT | 19.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 27.09.2017 | |
NO | 27.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5960170 (CHEN EVA [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 1, line 13 - line 33 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 48 * * column 11, line 59 - column 20, line 6 * * column 20, line 38 - line 60 * * figures 3,4a-4d, 5 *; | [A]WO2004114045 (NOKIA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [I]US2005283603 (RAMAN BALAN S [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1962218 (ALADDIN KNOWLEDGE SYSTEMS [IL]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] - [0015] , [0031] - [0034] *; | [A]US2008209558 (ZUNKE MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]US6480144 (MILLER RONALD HUGH [US], et al); | [A]US2003098883 (PENNELL MARK E [US], et al); | [X]US6624752 (KLITSGAARD NIELS CHRISTIAN [DK], et al); | [A]US2005182924 (SAUVE AARON [US], et al) | by applicant | US5960170 | EP1962218 |