EP2376973 - DUAL-VIEW STEREOSCOPIC DISPLAY USING LINEAR MODULATOR ARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2011/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCUS, Michael Alan 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | 02 /
AGNOSTINELLI, John Alphonse 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas KODAK Département Brevets Route de Demigny Z.I Nord B.P 21 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône / FR | Application number, filing date | 09837719.5 | 21.12.2009 | WO2009US06622 | Priority number, date | US20090351190 | 09.01.2009 Original published format: US 351190 | [2011/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010080123 | Date: | 15.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2376973 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/22 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
H04N13/341 (EP,US);
G02B30/24 (EP,US);
H04N2013/403 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STEREOSKOPISCHE ZWEIFACHANSICHTSANZEIGE MIT LINEAREN MODULATORANORDNUNGEN | [2011/42] | English: | DUAL-VIEW STEREOSCOPIC DISPLAY USING LINEAR MODULATOR ARRAYS | [2011/42] | French: | AFFICHAGE STÉRÉOSCOPIQUE À DOUBLE OBSERVATION UTILISANT DES RÉSEAUX DE MODULATEURS LINÉAIRES | [2011/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 13.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 21.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61174897 (SAKAMI HIROYUKI) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5875055 (MORISHIMA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1067805 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]JP2002148561 (CANON KK) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2003035885 (CANON KK) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2003107401 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [I]US6867775 (BUCK MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [I] 1-22 * abstract *; | [A]US2008123173 (KIM SUNG KYU [KR]) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5594843 (O'NEILL WILLIAM J [US]); | [A]US6175431 (WALDERN JONATHAN D [US], et al); | [A]US6456432 (LAZZARO GERARD M [US], et al); | [X]US2004017546 (AGOSTINELLI JOHN A [US], et al); | [X]US6867775 (BUCK MATTHIAS [DE], et al); | [A]US2006077545 (COBB JOSHUA M [US], et al) |