EP2388792 - SPARK PLUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP | [2013/36] |
Former [2011/47] | For all designated states NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8525 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI Akira c/o NGK Spark Plug Co. Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8525 / JP | 02 /
KATO Tomoaki c/o NGK Spark Plug Co. Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8525 / JP | 03 /
MUSASA Mamoru c/o NGK Spark Plug Co. Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8525 / JP | 04 /
HONDA Toshitaka c/o NGK Spark Plug Co. Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8525 / JP | [2011/47] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2017/27] |
Former [2011/47] | Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09838374.8 | 07.12.2009 | [2017/27] | WO2009JP70455 | Priority number, date | JP20090004313 | 13.01.2009 Original published format: JP 2009004313 | [2011/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010082409 | Date: | 22.07.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2388792 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2388792 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/20, H01T13/36 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
H01T13/14 (EP,US);
H01T13/20 (KR);
H01T13/36 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZÜNDKERZE | [2011/47] | English: | SPARK PLUG | [2011/47] | French: | BOUGIE D'ALLUMAGE | [2011/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2011 | Translation filed | 04.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 29.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2009 | AT | 05.07.2017 | CY | 05.07.2017 | CZ | 05.07.2017 | DK | 05.07.2017 | EE | 05.07.2017 | ES | 05.07.2017 | FI | 05.07.2017 | HR | 05.07.2017 | IT | 05.07.2017 | LT | 05.07.2017 | LV | 05.07.2017 | MC | 05.07.2017 | MK | 05.07.2017 | NL | 05.07.2017 | PL | 05.07.2017 | PT | 05.07.2017 | RO | 05.07.2017 | SE | 05.07.2017 | SI | 05.07.2017 | SK | 05.07.2017 | SM | 05.07.2017 | TR | 05.07.2017 | BG | 05.10.2017 | NO | 05.10.2017 | GR | 06.10.2017 | IS | 05.11.2017 | GB | 07.12.2017 | IE | 07.12.2017 | LU | 07.12.2017 | MT | 07.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 07.12.2009 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
GB | 07.12.2017 | ||
IE | 07.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.12.2017 | ||
MT | 07.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 07.12.2009 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
GB | 07.12.2017 | ||
IE | 07.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.12.2017 | ||
MT | 07.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 07.12.2009 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
GB | 07.12.2017 | ||
IE | 07.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.12.2017 | ||
MT | 07.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.12.2009 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
GB | 07.12.2017 | ||
IE | 07.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.12.2017 | ||
MT | 07.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
GB | 07.12.2017 | ||
IE | 07.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.12.2017 | ||
MT | 07.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
GB | 07.12.2017 | ||
IE | 07.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.12.2017 | ||
MT | 07.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
GB | 07.12.2017 | ||
IE | 07.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.12.2017 | ||
MT | 07.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 07.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.12.2017 | ||
MT | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 07.12.2017 | ||
MT | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 05.07.2017 | |
NO | 05.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000243535 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2008042539 (WALKER WILLIAM J [US]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0008]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0023]; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1220396 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1, 3, 5 *; | [A]JPH0945457 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JP2000243535 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO); | [Y]WO2007149772 (FEDERAL MOGUL CORP [US], et al); | [Y]JPH0945457 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) |