EP2429087 - INTERFERENCE CANCELLATION METHOD AND DATA TRANSMISSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. B1-3A Intellectual Property Department Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/28] |
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. B1-3A Intellectual Property Dept. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Sheng Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2012/11] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [2016/28] |
Former [2012/11] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09838580.0 | 12.05.2009 | [2016/28] | WO2009CN71756 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010130085 | Date: | 18.11.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2429087 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2429087 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/10, H04B7/04, H04L25/03, // H04B7/06 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
H04L25/03343 (EP,US);
H04B7/0413 (EP,US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03426 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/11] | H04B1/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTERFERENZUNTERDRÜCKUNGSVERFAHREN UND DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2012/11] | English: | INTERFERENCE CANCELLATION METHOD AND DATA TRANSMISSION DEVICE | [2012/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLIMINATION D'INTERFÉRENCES ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES | [2012/11] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2010 | Translation filed | 28.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2010 | Examination requested [2012/11] | 12.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.02.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2009 | AT | 13.07.2016 | BE | 13.07.2016 | CY | 13.07.2016 | CZ | 13.07.2016 | DK | 13.07.2016 | EE | 13.07.2016 | ES | 13.07.2016 | FI | 13.07.2016 | HR | 13.07.2016 | IT | 13.07.2016 | LT | 13.07.2016 | LV | 13.07.2016 | MC | 13.07.2016 | MK | 13.07.2016 | NL | 13.07.2016 | PL | 13.07.2016 | RO | 13.07.2016 | SE | 13.07.2016 | SI | 13.07.2016 | SK | 13.07.2016 | TR | 13.07.2016 | BG | 13.10.2016 | NO | 13.10.2016 | GR | 14.10.2016 | IS | 13.11.2016 | PT | 14.11.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 12.05.2009 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 12.05.2009 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.05.2009 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 13.07.2016 | |
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 13.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009075686 (GOMADAM KRISHNA S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-25 * * figures 1,5,8a,8b * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0071] * | [XI] - CADAMBE V R ET AL, "Interference Alignment and Degrees of Freedom of the -User Interference Channel", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, IEEE PRESS, USA, (20080801), vol. 54, no. 8, doi:10.1109/TIT.2008.926344, ISSN 0018-9448, pages 3425 - 3441, XP011231331 [X] 1-3,5,7-9,12,14 * the whole document * [I] 4,6,10,11,13,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIT.2008.926344 | [A] - KRISHNA GOMADAM ET AL, "Approaching the Capacity of Wireless Networks through Distributed Interference Alignment", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 2008. IEEE GLOBECOM 2008. IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081130), ISBN 978-1-4244-2324-8, pages 1 - 6, XP031370500 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0III] - paragraph [000V] * | International search | [A]CN101194433 (NOKIA CORP [FI]); | [A]CN101217304 (UNIV BEIJING POSTS & TELECOMM [CN]); | [A]CN101232478 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) |