EP2395471 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SECURITY DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lee, Young Bum Laillack Apt 2308-1302 Sang-dong Wonmi-gu Bucheon-si Gyeonggi-do 420-030 / KR | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09839760.7 | 18.12.2009 | WO2009KR07582 | Priority number, date | KR20090009286 | 05.02.2009 Original published format: KR 20090009286 | [2011/50] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010090393 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2395471 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/00, G07C9/00, G06F21/00, G06K17/00 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
G07C9/257 (EP,US);
G06F21/00 (KR);
G06K17/00 (KR);
G06Q50/10 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2011/50] | G06Q50/00, G06F21/00, G06K17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM KONTROLLIEREN VON SICHERHEITSDOKUMENTEN | [2011/50] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SECURITY DOCUMENTS | [2011/50] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MAÎTRISE DE DOCUMENTS DE SÉCURITÉ | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2011 | Translation filed | 25.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 11.02.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO9636186 (SENSORMATIC ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [I] 10 * abstract * * page 7, line 17 - page 9, line 25 * * page 11, line 31 - page 36, line 18 * * page 43, line 21 - page 49, line 27 * * claims 10-23 * * figures 1-24 * [A] 1-9; | [XY]WO9905660 (CHECKPOINT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 10 * abstract * * page 5, line 12 - page 42, line 11 * * figures 1-12 * [Y] 1-9; | [A]WO02089083 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [YA]EP1533767 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * figures 1--14e * [A] 10; | [A]EP1898362 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2004110690 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [A]KR20060107261 (UNIV INCHEON IND ACAD COOP [KR]); | [A]KR100723830B (ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH INSTITUTE); | [A]JP2008129807 (SHARP KK); | [A]KR100879807B (SOFTCAMP) |