EP2398649 - IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS AND IMAGE FORMING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | For all designated states Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUKAMOTO, Takeo 4-7-105 Ushikubohigashi 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-0014 / JP | 02 /
USUI, Yuuma 2-1-333 Kagahara 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-0055 / JP | 03 /
SEO, Manabu 41-E-404 Morinodai Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 226-0029 / JP | 04 /
HASEGAWA, Aino 5-119 Susukino 1-chome Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 225-0021 / JP | 05 /
ORITO, Takeshi 4-15-2-603, Kikuna, Kouhoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-0011 / JP | 06 /
SUZUKI, Ryota 17-1-207 Kamimeguro 5-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-0051 / JP | [2012/04] |
Former [2011/52] | 01 /
TSUKAMOTO, Takeo 4-7-105 Ushikubohigashi 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-0014 / JP | ||
02 /
USUI, Yuuma 2-1-333 Kagahara 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-0055 / JP | |||
03 /
SEO, Manabu 41-E-404 Morinodai Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 226-0029 / JP | |||
04 /
HASEGAWA, Aino 5-119 Susukino 1-chome Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 225-0021 / JP | |||
05 /
ORITO, Takeshi 47-31-302 Kizuki 3-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-0025 / JP | |||
06 /
SUZUKI, Ryota 17-1-207 Kamimeguro 5-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-0051 / JP | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2014/17] |
Former [2011/52] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09840422.1 | 05.11.2009 | WO2009JP69237 | Priority number, date | JP20090037033 | 19.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009037033 | [2011/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010095319 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2398649 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2398649 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/385, B41M5/00 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
B41J2/0057 (EP,US);
B41J2/385 (KR);
B41M5/00 (EP,KR,US);
B41M5/0256 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BILDERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2011/52] | English: | IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS AND IMAGE FORMING METHOD | [2011/52] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'IMAGE | [2011/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 13.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2009 | AT | 23.04.2014 | BE | 23.04.2014 | CY | 23.04.2014 | CZ | 23.04.2014 | DK | 23.04.2014 | EE | 23.04.2014 | ES | 23.04.2014 | FI | 23.04.2014 | HR | 23.04.2014 | IT | 23.04.2014 | LT | 23.04.2014 | LV | 23.04.2014 | MC | 23.04.2014 | MK | 23.04.2014 | MT | 23.04.2014 | NL | 23.04.2014 | PL | 23.04.2014 | RO | 23.04.2014 | SE | 23.04.2014 | SI | 23.04.2014 | SK | 23.04.2014 | SM | 23.04.2014 | TR | 23.04.2014 | BG | 23.07.2014 | NO | 23.07.2014 | GR | 24.07.2014 | IS | 23.08.2014 | PT | 25.08.2014 | IE | 05.11.2014 | LU | 05.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 05.11.2009 | |
AT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
SM | 23.04.2014 | ||
TR | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
IE | 05.11.2014 | ||
LU | 05.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.11.2009 | |
AT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
SM | 23.04.2014 | ||
TR | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
IE | 05.11.2014 | ||
LU | 05.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
SM | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
IE | 05.11.2014 | ||
LU | 05.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
IE | 05.11.2014 | ||
LU | 05.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 23.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008055356 (YAMANOBE JUN [JP]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2002283716 (CANON KK) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS63218363 (RICOH KK, et al); | [A]JPS5941279 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) |