EP2394153 - EMISSIONS MONITORING APPARATUS, SYSTEM, AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W R Systems, Ltd. 2500 Almeda Ave. Suite 214 Norfolk, VA 23513-2403 / US | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNS, Robert, G. 924 Ludway Court Virginia Beach, VA 23454 / US | 02 /
VIRAY, Reginald, L. 3097 Winterberry Lane Virginia Beach VA 23453 / US | 03 /
WEAVER, Edward, P. 2493 Smokehouse Road Virginia Beach VA 23456 / US | 04 /
LUNDIN, Nathan, J. 5429 Susquehanna Drive Virginia Beach VA 23462 / US | 05 /
JONES, Megan 4220 N. Witchduck Road Virginia Beach VA 23455 / US | [2012/08] |
Former [2011/50] | 01 /
JOHNS, Robert, G. 543 Nighthawk Place Virginia Beach VA 23451 / US | ||
02 /
VIRAY, Reginald, L. 3097 Winterberry Lane Virginia Beach VA 23453 / US | |||
03 /
WEAVER, Edward, P. 2493 Smokehouse Road Virginia Beach VA 23456 / US | |||
04 /
LUNDIN, Nathan, J. 5429 Susquehanna Drive Virginia Beach VA 23462 / US | |||
05 /
JONES, Megan 4220 N. Witchduck Road Virginia Beach VA 23455 / US | Representative(s) | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/46] | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2011/50] | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 09840590.5 | 08.12.2009 | [2015/46] | WO2009US67139 | Priority number, date | US20090202319P | 18.02.2009 Original published format: US 202319 P | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010096135 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394153 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2394153 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N9/00, G01M15/10, F01N11/00 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
F01N11/00 (EP,US);
G01M15/108 (EP,US);
F01N2560/12 (EP,US);
F01N2590/02 (EP,US);
F01N2900/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/50] | G01N9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EMISSIONSÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG, -SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2011/50] | English: | EMISSIONS MONITORING APPARATUS, SYSTEM, AND METHOD | [2011/50] | French: | APPAREIL, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE D'ÉMISSIONS | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 24.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2015 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 02.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2009 | AT | 11.11.2015 | BE | 11.11.2015 | BG | 11.11.2015 | CY | 11.11.2015 | CZ | 11.11.2015 | DK | 11.11.2015 | EE | 11.11.2015 | ES | 11.11.2015 | FI | 11.11.2015 | HR | 11.11.2015 | IT | 11.11.2015 | LT | 11.11.2015 | LV | 11.11.2015 | MC | 11.11.2015 | MK | 11.11.2015 | MT | 11.11.2015 | NL | 11.11.2015 | PL | 11.11.2015 | RO | 11.11.2015 | SE | 11.11.2015 | SI | 11.11.2015 | SK | 11.11.2015 | SM | 11.11.2015 | TR | 11.11.2015 | IE | 08.12.2015 | LU | 08.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | FR | 11.01.2016 | NO | 11.02.2016 | GR | 12.02.2016 | IS | 11.03.2016 | PT | 11.03.2016 | DE | 01.07.2016 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 08.12.2009 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
BG | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IE | 08.12.2015 | ||
LU | 08.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 11.01.2016 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
DE | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 08.12.2009 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
BG | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IE | 08.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 11.01.2016 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
DE | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
IE | 08.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 11.01.2016 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
DE | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
IE | 08.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 11.01.2016 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
DE | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
IE | 08.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
DE | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
IE | 08.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
DE | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
IE | 08.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
LT | 11.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1972925 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] * * paragraphs [0036] - [0039] * [Y] 2-7,9-15; | [Y]US2004200265 (EDEN GIDEON [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1176412 (SENSORS INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005188745 (STAPHANOS STEPHEN T [US], et al) [Y] 7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] , [0047] *; | [Y]US5109691 (CORRIGAN COLIN D [CA], et al) [Y] 2,5,6,9,14,15 * abstract * * column 6, lines 43-60 * * column 10, lines 50-68 * * column 12, lines 47-62 * * column 13, lines 24-67 * * column 17, lines 40-67 * | International search | [Y]US2004200265 (EDEN GIDEON [US], et al); | [Y]EP1176412 (SENSORS INC [US]); | [Y]US5109691 (CORRIGAN COLIN D [CA], et al); | [Y]US5913253 (FLORIO SALVATORE [IT], et al); | [Y]US2005188745 (STAPHANOS STEPHEN T [US], et al); | [A]US3989938 (AUTH GERALD L); | [A]US2002026822 (READING ANDREW R [US], et al); | [A]US2007296976 (JANNASCH OTMAR [DE]) | Examination | JP2002048711 | by applicant | EP1972925 | US2004200265 | EP1176412 | US2005188745 | US5109691 |