EP2403102 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INCREASING THE NUMBER OF POWERED DEVICES SUPPORTED BY POWER OVER ETHERNET SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2017/13] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/01] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jun No. 388 Ningqiao Road Pudong Jinqiao Shanghai 201206 / CN | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2017/13] |
Former [2014/17] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/01] | Benezeth, Philippe J.L. M., et al Feray Lenne Conseil Le Centralis 63 Avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg La Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 09840618.4 | 25.02.2009 | [2017/13] | WO2009CN00201 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010096950 | Date: | 02.09.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2403102 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2403102 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, G06F1/26, H04L12/10 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
H04L12/10 (EP,KR,US);
H02J7/00 (KR);
G06F1/266 (EP,KR,US);
H02J7/02 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2012/01] | H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERGRÖSSERN DER ANZAHL DER DURCH EIN SYSTEM MIT VERSORGUNG ÜBER ETHERNET UNTERSTÜTZTEN VERSORGTEN EINRICHTUNGEN | [2012/01] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INCREASING THE NUMBER OF POWERED DEVICES SUPPORTED BY POWER OVER ETHERNET SYSTEM | [2012/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR AUGMENTER LE NOMBRE DE DISPOSITIFS ALIMENTÉS PRIS EN CHARGE PAR UN SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION SOUS ETHERNET | [2012/01] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2011 | Translation filed | 26.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 19.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2009 | AT | 29.03.2017 | CY | 29.03.2017 | CZ | 29.03.2017 | DK | 29.03.2017 | EE | 29.03.2017 | ES | 29.03.2017 | FI | 29.03.2017 | HR | 29.03.2017 | IT | 29.03.2017 | LT | 29.03.2017 | LV | 29.03.2017 | MC | 29.03.2017 | MK | 29.03.2017 | NL | 29.03.2017 | PL | 29.03.2017 | RO | 29.03.2017 | SE | 29.03.2017 | SI | 29.03.2017 | SK | 29.03.2017 | TR | 29.03.2017 | BG | 29.06.2017 | NO | 29.06.2017 | GR | 30.06.2017 | IS | 29.07.2017 | PT | 31.07.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 25.02.2009 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
TR | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
TR | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 29.03.2017 | |
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008005601 (DIAB WAEL WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0071] * * figures 1-12 * | International search | [A]US5726636 (HAYES JR JOHN JOSEPH [US]); | [X]CN1290862 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [X]CN1638228 (IBM [US]) | Examination | US2003214273 |