EP2416513 - BROADCASTING METHOD AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Yongjun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09842494.8 | 02.04.2009 | WO2009CN71145 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010111837 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2416513 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2416513 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L12/18 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
H04L1/08 (EP,US);
H04L12/1868 (EP,US);
H04L45/122 (US);
H04L45/20 (US);
H04L12/18 (US);
H04L2001/0097 (EP,US);
H04L45/12 (US);
H04L45/123 (US);
H04L45/126 (US);
H04L45/127 (US);
H04L45/44 (US);
H04L45/46 (US);
|
Former IPC [2012/06] | H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSSTRAHLUNGSVERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSEINRICHTUNG | [2012/06] | English: | BROADCASTING METHOD AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2012/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RADIODIFFUSION ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2011 | Translation filed | 14.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 26.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2009 | BE | 19.06.2013 | CY | 19.06.2013 | CZ | 19.06.2013 | DK | 19.06.2013 | EE | 19.06.2013 | HR | 19.06.2013 | LT | 19.06.2013 | LV | 19.06.2013 | MC | 19.06.2013 | MK | 19.06.2013 | MT | 19.06.2013 | PL | 19.06.2013 | RO | 19.06.2013 | SE | 19.06.2013 | SI | 19.06.2013 | SK | 19.06.2013 | TR | 19.06.2013 | BG | 19.09.2013 | NO | 19.09.2013 | GR | 20.09.2013 | IS | 19.10.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 02.04.2009 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
TR | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 02.04.2009 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | BE | 19.06.2013 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/52] | BE | 19.06.2013 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | BE | 19.06.2013 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 19.06.2013 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | BE | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | IT | 02.04.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | BE | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 19.06.2013 | |
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | HR | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | HR | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | LT | 19.06.2013 | |
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | LT | 19.06.2013 | |
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 19.06.2013 | |
NO | 19.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2009102841 (TELCORDIA TECH INC [US], et al) [E] 1-12 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0127] *; | [I]KR20080060588 (KNU INDUSTRY COOPERATION FOUND [KR]) [I] 1-12 * abstract *; | [I]US5345558 (OPHER AYAL [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * column 5, line 5 - line 55 * * column 13, line 56 - column 14, line 25 * * figure 9c *; | [A]US2002150099 (PUNG HUNG KENG [SG], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0092] * | International search | [A]CN1627718 (LENOVO BEIJING CO LTD [CN]); | [X]CN1996804 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); | [A]CN101212495 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) |